blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1053170 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1053170



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 420
13.10.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 17
13.10.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 17
13.10.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 18
13.10.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 18
13.10.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 22
13.10.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 22
08.10.2004 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
08.10.2004 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
07.02.2003 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
21.02.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.11.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.11.2001 Translation of priority document Search / examination 6
26.11.2001 Translation of priority document Search / examination 8
26.11.2001 Translation of priority document Search / examination 11
26.11.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
26.11.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
21.11.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 9
16.08.2001 Filing of a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
16.08.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
08.08.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
31.07.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
06.04.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
06.04.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.04.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
02.02.2001 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
30.10.2000 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
11.10.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
02.10.2000 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
02.10.2000 Claims Search / examination 3
02.10.2000 Description Search / examination 2
22.09.2000 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
22.09.2000 Claims Search / examination 3
22.09.2000 Description Search / examination 2
26.07.2000 Annex Search / examination 6
26.07.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
26.07.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
18.07.2000 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
12.07.2000 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
20.04.2000 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
20.04.2000 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.04.2000 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.02.2000 Annex PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
11.02.2000 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
11.02.2000 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
11.02.2000 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
04.02.2000 Annex PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
04.02.2000 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
04.02.2000 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
04.11.1999 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
15.10.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
07.10.1999 Copy of the corrected international search report Search / examination 4
07.10.1999 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 2
20.09.1999 Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.08.1999 Priority document Search / examination 22
20.08.1999 Priority document Search / examination 18
20.08.1999 Priority document Search / examination 18
17.08.1999 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.08.1999 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.08.1999 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.08.1999 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
06.08.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
04.08.1999 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.08.1999 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
19.07.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 27
26.05.1999 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 4
08.03.1999 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
08.03.1999 Claims International Searching Authority 3
08.03.1999 Description International Searching Authority 10
08.03.1999 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
08.03.1999 Drawings International Searching Authority 12