blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1053170


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.09.2004  [2004/40]
21.03.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.05.2003  [2003/19]
07.02.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  26.03.2003  [2003/13]
15.02.2002 (Expected) grant published on  03.04.2002  [2002/14]
31.01.2002 Renewal fee
28.11.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
10.08.2001 Communication of intention to grant
10.08.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.08.2001 Communication of intention to grant
06.08.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.04.2001 First examination report
30.03.2001 Communication of intention to grant
29.01.2001 Renewal fee
06.10.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.11.2000 [2000/47]
06.10.2000 Amendment by applicant
06.10.2000 Request for examination filed published on  22.11.2000 [2000/47]
22.09.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
01.08.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
01.08.2000 Change - extension states
27.07.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
21.07.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
19.07.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
04.09.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
13.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
12.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
30.07.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
28.05.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
23.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication