blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1053170
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20010040375Global Dossier 15.05.2001A
Priority number Date
IT9900009 20.01.1999
ITFR980004 23.03.1998
ITFR980001 21.01.1998
ITFR980009 22.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002500988Global Dossier 15.01.2002A
Priority number Date
IT9900009 20.01.1999
ITFR980004 23.03.1998
ITFR980001 21.01.1998
ITFR980009 22.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1053170Global Dossier 03.04.2002B1
EP1053170 22.11.2000A2
Priority number Date
IT9900009 20.01.1999
ITFR980004 23.03.1998
ITFR980001 21.01.1998
ITFR980009 22.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AR014719 28.03.2001A1
Priority number Date
ITFR980004 23.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AR019875 20.03.2002A1
Priority number Date
ITFR980009 22.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AR022775 04.09.2002A2
Priority number Date
ITFR980004 23.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT215460T 15.04.2002T
Priority number Date
IT9900009 20.01.1999
ITFR980004 23.03.1998
ITFR980001 21.01.1998
ITFR980009 22.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2073399 09.08.1999A
Priority number Date
IT9900009 20.01.1999
ITFR980004 23.03.1998
ITFR980001 21.01.1998
ITFR980009 22.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BG104688 30.03.2001A
Priority number Date
IT9900009 20.01.1999
ITFR980004 23.03.1998
ITFR980001 21.01.1998
ITFR980009 22.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9907187 17.10.2000A
Priority number Date
IT9900009 20.01.1999
ITFR980004 23.03.1998
ITFR980001 21.01.1998
ITFR980009 22.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2318970 29.07.1999A1
Priority number Date
IT9900009 20.01.1999
ITFR980004 23.03.1998
ITFR980001 21.01.1998
ITFR980009 22.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69901166T 21.11.2002T2
DE69901166D 08.05.2002D1
Priority number Date
IT9900009 20.01.1999
ITFR980004 23.03.1998
ITFR980001 21.01.1998
ITFR980009 22.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK1053170T 29.07.2002T3
Priority number Date
IT9900009 20.01.1999
ITFR980004 23.03.1998
ITFR980001 21.01.1998
ITFR980009 22.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EA002369 25.04.2002B1
EA200000779 26.02.2001A1
Priority number Date
IT9900009 20.01.1999
ITFR980004 23.03.1998
ITFR980001 21.01.1998
ITFR980009 22.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HU0100824 28.03.2002A3
HU0100824 28.06.2001A2
Priority number Date
IT9900009 20.01.1999
ITFR980004 23.03.1998
ITFR980001 21.01.1998
ITFR980009 22.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL137396D 24.07.2001D0
Priority number Date
IT9900009 20.01.1999
ITFR980004 23.03.1998
ITFR980001 21.01.1998
ITFR980009 22.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IT1305352 04.05.2001B1
ITFR980001 21.07.1999A1
ITFR980001D 21.01.1998D0
Priority number Date
ITFR980001 21.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IT1305356 04.05.2001B1
ITFR980009 24.01.2000A1
ITFR980009D 22.07.1998D0
Priority number Date
ITFR980009 22.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ITFR980004 23.09.1999A1
ITFR980004D 23.03.1998D0
Priority number Date
ITFR980004 23.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MXPA00007109 08.05.2002A
Priority number Date
IT9900009 20.01.1999
ITFR980004 23.03.1998
ITFR980001 21.01.1998
ITFR980009 22.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NO20003722L 20.09.2000L
NO20003722D 20.07.2000D0
Priority number Date
IT9900009 20.01.1999
ITFR980004 23.03.1998
ITFR980001 21.01.1998
ITFR980009 22.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL341944 07.05.2001A1
Priority number Date
IT9900009 20.01.1999
ITFR980004 23.03.1998
ITFR980001 21.01.1998
ITFR980009 22.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6595535 22.07.2003B2
US2003094782 22.05.2003A1
Priority number Date
IT9900009 20.01.1999
ITFR980009 22.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9937528Global Dossier 07.10.1999A3
WO9937528 29.07.1999A2
Priority number Date
ITFR980004 23.03.1998
ITFR980001 21.01.1998
ITFR980009 22.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1288425 21.03.2001A
Priority number Date
ITFR980004 23.03.1998
ITFR980001 21.01.1998
ITFR980009 22.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2179613T 16.01.2003T3
Priority number Date
ITFR980004 23.03.1998
ITFR980001 21.01.1998
ITFR980009 22.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT1053170E 30.09.2002E
Priority number Date
ITFR980004 23.03.1998
ITFR980001 21.01.1998
ITFR980009 22.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TR200002117T 21.12.2000T2
Priority number Date
ITFR980004 23.03.1998
ITFR980001 21.01.1998
ITFR980009 22.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
YU46700 12.08.2002A
Priority number Date
ITFR980004 23.03.1998
ITFR980001 21.01.1998
ITFR980009 22.07.1998