Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1053170

EP1053170 - BICYCLE OR THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.02.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI
published on 29.09.2004  [2004/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ERL Invenzioni S.r.l.
Via Salceto, 24
03039 Sora / IT
[2000/47]
Inventor(s)01 / FARINA, Ernesto
via Salceto
I.03039 Sora / IT
[2000/47]
Representative(s)Iannone, Carlo Luigi
Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A.
Via Piemonte 26
00187 Roma / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]Iannone, Carlo Luigi
Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte, 26
00187 Roma / IT
Application number, filing date99901110.920.01.1999
[2000/47]
WO1999IT00009
Priority number, dateIT1998FR0000121.01.1998         Original published format: IT FR980001
IT1998FR0000423.03.1998         Original published format: IT FR980004
IT1998FR0000922.07.1998         Original published format: IT FR980009
[2000/47]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9937528
Date:29.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/30]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1053170
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999
[2000/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1053170
Date:03.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:B62M1/04
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/47]
Extension statesAL18.07.2000
RO18.07.2000
SI18.07.2000
TitleGerman:FAHRRAD ODER DERGLEICHEN[2000/47]
English:BICYCLE OR THE LIKE[2000/47]
French:BICYCLETTE OU SIMILAIRE[2000/47]
Entry into regional phase20.01.1999Translation filed 
18.07.2000National basic fee paid 
18.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
22.09.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2001Fee for grant paid
21.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
09.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI03.04.2002
GR03.04.2002
[2004/40]
Former [2003/19]GR03.04.2002
Cited inInternational search[XA]US4456276  (BORTOLIN PETER [AU]) [X] 1-5 * column A; figures 6,10 * [A] 6;
 [X]EP0285858  (BRAI SYSTEMS SRL [IT]) [X] 1,3 * abstract *;
 [X]FR837231  (BENOTTEAU) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [X]FR1102611  (BENOTTEAU) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4445701  (STROUD EDWARD A [CA]) [X] 1 * column W *