Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970316

EP0970316 - IMPROVED FRICTION PLATE, IN PARTICULAR FOR MOTOR VEHICLE CLUTCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.08.2003
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.09.2003  [2003/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VALEO
43, rue Bayen
75017 Paris / FR
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / THIRION DE BRIEL, Jacques
57, boulevard Gambetta
F-92700 Colombes / FR
02 / HONORE, Emmanuelle
16, rue David d'Angers
F-75019 Paris / FR
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Gamonal, Didier
Valeo Embrayages
Propriété Industrielle
Le Triangle
15 Rue des Rosiers
93585 Saint Ouen / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Gamonal, Didier
Valeo Embrayages, Propriété Industrielle, Le Triangle, 15 rue des Rosiers
93585 Saint Ouen / FR
Application number, filing date99901638.928.01.1999
[2000/02]
WO1999FR00161
Priority number, dateFR1998000089128.01.1998         Original published format: FR 9800891
WO1998FR0015328.01.1998         Original published format: PCT/FR98/00153
FR1998001610021.12.1998         Original published format: FR 9816100
[2000/02]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9939110
Date:05.08.1999
Language:FR
[1999/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970316
Date:12.01.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970316
Date:02.10.2002
Language:FR
[2002/40]
Search report(s)International search reportEP05.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:F16D13/64
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesES,   GB,   IT [2000/02]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE REIBSCHEIBE, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE KRAFTFAHRZEUGKUPPLUNG[2000/02]
English:IMPROVED FRICTION PLATE, IN PARTICULAR FOR MOTOR VEHICLE CLUTCH[2000/02]
French:DISQUE DE FRICTION PERFECTIONNE, NOTAMMENT POUR UN EMBRAYAGE DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase08.09.1999National basic fee paid 
08.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
09.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.07.2002Fee for grant paid
02.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[DA]EP0579554  (VALEO [FR]) [DA] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4993531  (VILLATA GINO [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantEP0579554