Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1049653

EP1049653 - THICKENING OF AQUEOUS MINERAL SUSPENSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ciba Specialty Chemicals Water Treatments Limited
Cleckheaton Road, Low Moor, P.O. Box 38 Bradford
West Yorkshire BD12 0JZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/45]For all designated states
Ciba Specialty Chemicals Water Treatments Limited
Cleckheaton Road, Low Moor, P.O. Box 38
Bradford, West Yorkshire BD12 0JZ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / ALLEN, Anthony Peter
4 George Street, Saltaire
Shipley, West Yorkshire BD18 3EZ / GB
02 / SEDDERS, Peter Albert
23 Harlech Avenue, Leeds
West Yorkshire LS11 7DT / GB
[2000/45]
Application number, filing date99901736.118.01.1999
[2000/45]
WO1999GB00160
Priority number, dateGB1998000152423.01.1998         Original published format: GB 9801524
[2000/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9937589
Date:29.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1049653
Date:08.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999
[2000/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1049653
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:C02F11/14, C02F1/56, B01D21/01
[2000/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/45]
TitleGerman:EINDICKUNG VON WÄSSRIGEN MINERALSUSPENSIONEN[2000/45]
English:THICKENING OF AQUEOUS MINERAL SUSPENSIONS[2000/45]
French:EPAISSISSEMENT DE SUSPENSIONS MINERALES AQUEUSES[2000/45]
Entry into regional phase11.07.2000National basic fee paid 
11.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/45]
14.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2003Fee for grant paid
24.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.06.2003
BE25.06.2003
CH25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
FR25.06.2003
IT25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
DK25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
DE26.09.2003
GB18.01.2004
LU18.01.2004
ES19.01.2004
IE19.01.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2006/14]AT25.06.2003
BE25.06.2003
CH25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
FR25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
DK25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
DE26.09.2003
GB18.01.2004
LU18.01.2004
ES19.01.2004
IE19.01.2004
Former [2006/12]AT25.06.2003
BE25.06.2003
CH25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
DK25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
DE26.09.2003
GB18.01.2004
LU18.01.2004
ES19.01.2004
IE19.01.2004
Former [2005/23]AT25.06.2003
BE25.06.2003
CH25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
DK25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
DE26.09.2003
GB18.01.2004
LU18.01.2004
IE19.01.2004
Former [2005/03]AT25.06.2003
BE25.06.2003
CH25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
DK25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
DE26.09.2003
GB18.01.2004
IE19.01.2004
Former [2005/01]AT25.06.2003
BE25.06.2003
CH25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
DK25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
DE26.09.2003
GB18.01.2004
Former [2004/29]AT25.06.2003
BE25.06.2003
CH25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
DK25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
DE26.09.2003
Former [2004/28]AT25.06.2003
BE25.06.2003
CH25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
DE26.09.2003
Former [2004/23]AT25.06.2003
CH25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
DE26.09.2003
Former [2004/13]AT25.06.2003
CH25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
Former [2004/10]AT25.06.2003
CH25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
SE25.09.2003
Former [2004/05]AT25.06.2003
CH25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
Former [2004/03]AT25.06.2003
CH25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
Former [2004/02]CH25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]US3408293  (DAJANI MAHMOUD T, et al) [A] 1-7,11,12 * column 4, lines 27-31 * * column 10, lines 1-17; claims 1-3 *;
 [PA]US5779910  (DONLIN WILLIAM T [US]) [PA] 1-7,11,12 * column 1, lines 55-66 * * column 5, lines 20-22; claims 1-4 *;
 [A]AU1776397  (CYTEC TECH CORP) [A] 1-7,11,12;
 [A]EP0055489  (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [A] 1-7,11 * pages 1-4 * * page 9, lines 1-13; examples 8,12,17,22,23; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]US3539510  (PRIESING CHARLES P, et al) [A] 1-7 * claims 1-10 *;
 [A]JPS63252600  ;
 [A]US4104226  (MELZER JAROSLAV, et al) [A] 1-7,10 * example 1; claims 1-6 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890210), vol. 013, no. 061, Database accession no. (C - 567), [A] 1-7,10,11 * abstract *