blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973979

EP0973979 - SYSTEM FOR MAKING ASSEMBLY PANELS AND USE FOR PRODUCING MODULAR STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.01.2005
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lts Properties
Dokweg 19 Maduro
Plaza Curaçao / AN
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Lts Properties
Dokweg 19
Maduro, Plaza Curaçao / AN
Inventor(s)01 / VAN LOO, Raoul
Lojovicka 20/797
142 00 Praha / CZ
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Burtin, Jean-François
Cabinet Gefib c/o Sté Delpharm Immeuble Le Poversy Bât. B 6-8 rue du 4 septembre
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Burtin, Jean-François
Cabinet Gefib 55 rue Aristide Briand
92309 Levallois-Perret / FR
Former [2000/04]Burtin, Jean-François
Cabinet GEFIB 85 Rue Anatole France
92300 Levallois Perret / FR
Application number, filing date99901822.908.02.1999
[2000/04]
WO1999IB00220
Priority number, dateFR1998000153310.02.1998         Original published format: FR 9801533
[2000/04]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9941465
Date:19.08.1999
Language:FR
[1999/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973979
Date:26.01.2000
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.08.1999
ClassificationIPC:E04B1/10, E04B2/74
[2000/04]
CPC:
E04B2/7451 (EP); E04B1/10 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:BAUSYSTEM VON PANEELEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON MODULAREN KONSTRUKTIONEN[2000/04]
English:SYSTEM FOR MAKING ASSEMBLY PANELS AND USE FOR PRODUCING MODULAR STRUCTURES[2000/04]
French:SYSTEME DE CONSTRUCTION DE PANNEAUX D'ASSEMBLAGE ET LEUR UTILISATION EN VUE DE LA REALISATION DE CONSTRUCTIONS MODULAIRES[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase29.10.1999National basic fee paid 
29.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
17.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/08]
10.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
02.05.2000M01   Fee paid on   10.05.2000
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200204   M06   Fee paid on   23.08.2002
29.02.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XA]AU4456868  (PERMAWALL CONSTRUCTION CO.) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 5,7,8,10,12-14;
 [XA]US2400162  (W. J. MULLIGAN) [X] 1,2,4,5,10,12-14 * the whole document * [A] 7,8;
 [X]FR2050793  (FROID SATAM NEVE) [X] 1-3,5,10,12-14 * the whole document *;
 [XA]US4165591  (C. M. FITZGIBBON) [X] 1 * column W * [A] 3-5,10,12-14;
 [A]GB1502869  (IBERICA DEL FRIO) [A] 1,2,6,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR932997  (SIR ROBERT MC ALPINE & SONS) [A] 1,4,7,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE808782  (M. KÜHL) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2621378  (M. D. WILSON) [A] 1 * column W *
 [XA]  - J. BERTHIER, "avis n 2/74-14 sur la maison A.T.M.B.", CAHIERS DU CENTRE SCIENTIFIQUE ET TECHNIQUE DU BATIMENT., PARIS FR, (197410), no. 153, pages 1 - 4, XP002080357 [X] 1,2,4,5,10,12-14 * the whole document * [A] 3
 [X]  - P. ROGER, "brioude", CAHIERS DU CENTRE SCIENTIFIQUE ET TECHNIQUE DU BATIMENT., PARIS FR, (1969), no. 99, XP002080358 [X] 1,2,5,7,10-14 * the whole document *
 [XA]  - J. MERIOT, "constat de traditionnalité maison chaletplastic", CAHIERS DU CENTRE SCIENTIFIQUE ET TECHNIQUE DU BATIMENT., PARIS FR, (197310), no. 143, XP002080359 [X] 1 * the whole document * [A]
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.