Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970857

EP0970857 - SEAT BELT RETRACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.02.2005
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.04.2005  [2005/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ASHIMORI KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
10-18, Kitahorie 3-chome, Nishiku Osaka-shi
Osaka-hu 550-0014 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Ashimori Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
10-18, Kitahorie 3-chome, Nishiku
Osaka-shi, Osaka-hu 550-0014 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TANAKA, Hiroshi
13-17-90-402, Koyanagi-cho
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka-hu 567-0852 / JP
02 / NISHIKAWA, Masao
5-2-27-702, Senrioka
Settsu-shi, Osaka-hu 566-0001 / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Senior, Alan Murray , et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Senior, Alan Murray , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date99901936.703.02.1999
[2000/02]
WO1999JP00465
Priority number, dateJP1998004120905.02.1998         Original published format: JP 4120998
[2000/02]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9939943
Date:12.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970857
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970857
Date:14.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP12.08.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60R22/28
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/02]
TitleGerman:AUTOMATIK-SICHERHEITSGURT[2000/02]
English:SEAT BELT RETRACTOR[2000/02]
French:ENROULEUR AUTOMATIQUE DE CEINTURE DE SECURITE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase27.10.1999Translation filed 
27.10.1999National basic fee paid 
27.10.1999Search fee paid 
27.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
03.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.01.2004Fee for grant paid
19.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US4322046  (TANAKA KATSUYUKI, et al) [X] 1-6 * figure - * * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 5 *;
 [X]EP0297537  (NIPPON SEIKO KK [JP]) [X] 1-6 * figure 1 * * abstract * * column 4, line 20 - column 5, line 29 *
International search[X]JPH09277904  (NIPPON SEIKO KK);
 [X]JPH106922  (NIPPON SEIKO KK)