blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1047361 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1047361



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 81
09.10.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
25.05.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
05.06.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.04.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
11.04.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
11.04.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
20.12.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
20.12.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
20.12.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 7
20.09.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
29.08.2000 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
29.08.2000 Translation of priority document Search / examination 6
11.07.2000 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
29.06.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
29.11.1999 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
08.11.1999 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
02.11.1999 Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) International Searching Authority 2
13.10.1999 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.10.1999 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.08.1999 Priority document Search / examination 10
09.08.1999 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
06.08.1999 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
29.07.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
12.07.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
12.07.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 9