blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1047361


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.03.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.04.2008  [2008/17]
20.04.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2007  [2007/21]
17.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.04.2006  [2006/14]
22.04.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.06.2005  [2005/23]
03.12.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.01.2005  [2005/03]
26.11.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.01.2005  [2005/02]
12.11.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.12.2004  [2004/53]
24.09.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.11.2004  [2004/46]
11.06.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.07.2004  [2004/31]
28.05.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.07.2004  [2004/29]
21.05.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.07.2004  [2004/28]
21.05.2004 No opposition filed within time limit published on  07.07.2004  [2004/28]
09.04.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.05.2004  [2004/22]
27.02.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.04.2004  [2004/16]
13.02.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.03.2004  [2004/14]
30.01.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.03.2004  [2004/12]
19.01.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.03.2004  [2004/10]
30.05.2003 (Expected) grant published on  16.07.2003  [2003/29]
24.04.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.02.2003 Renewal fee
17.12.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
25.02.2002 Renewal fee
08.02.2001 Renewal fee
15.09.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.11.2000 [2000/44]
15.09.2000 Request for examination filed published on  02.11.2000 [2000/44]
11.09.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
03.08.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
24.07.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
11.07.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
07.07.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
03.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
04.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
26.07.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
02.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication