Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1047361
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1047361Global Dossier 16.07.2003B1
EP1047361 02.11.2000A1
Priority number Date
NO9900012 14.01.1999
NO980205 16.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT245011T 15.08.2003T
Priority number Date
NO9900012 14.01.1999
NO980205 16.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2190699 02.08.1999A
Priority number Date
NO9900012 14.01.1999
NO980205 16.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2318962 22.07.1999A1
Priority number Date
NO9900012 14.01.1999
NO980205 16.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69909590D 21.08.2003D1
Priority number Date
NO9900012 14.01.1999
NO980205 16.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6488699 03.12.2002B1
Priority number Date
NO9900012 14.01.1999
NO980205 16.01.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9936012Global Dossier 22.07.1999A1
Priority number Date
NO980205 16.01.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
NO306044B 13.09.1999B1
NO980205L 19.07.1999L
NO980205D 16.01.1998D0
Priority number Date
NO980205 16.01.1998