Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1047361

EP1047361 - COOLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.05.2004
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rypass, Gro-Johanne
Sven Svensenvei 8
3014 Drammen / NO
For all designated states
Rypass, Stein
Sven Svensenvei 8
3014 Drammen / NO
[2000/44]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99902003.514.01.1999
[2000/44]
WO1999NO00012
Priority number, dateNO1998000020516.01.1998         Original published format: NO 980205
[2000/44]
Filing languageNO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9936012
Date:22.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1047361
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999
[2000/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1047361
Date:16.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE22.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61F7/12
[2000/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/44]
TitleGerman:KÜHLGERÄT[2000/44]
English:COOLING DEVICE[2000/44]
French:DISPOSITIF DE REFROIDISSEMENT[2000/44]
Entry into regional phase14.01.1999Translation filed 
29.06.2000National basic fee paid 
29.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
29.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
20.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.04.2003Fee for grant paid
11.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.07.2003
BE16.07.2003
CH16.07.2003
CY16.07.2003
FI16.07.2003
FR16.07.2003
IT16.07.2003
LI16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
DK16.10.2003
GR16.10.2003
SE16.10.2003
DE17.10.2003
ES27.10.2003
PT16.12.2003
GB14.01.2004
IE14.01.2004
LU14.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/21]AT16.07.2003
BE16.07.2003
CH16.07.2003
CY16.07.2003
FI16.07.2003
FR16.07.2003
LI16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
DK16.10.2003
GR16.10.2003
SE16.10.2003
DE17.10.2003
ES27.10.2003
PT16.12.2003
GB14.01.2004
IE14.01.2004
LU14.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
Former [2006/14]AT16.07.2003
BE16.07.2003
CH16.07.2003
FI16.07.2003
FR16.07.2003
LI16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
DK16.10.2003
GR16.10.2003
SE16.10.2003
DE17.10.2003
ES27.10.2003
PT16.12.2003
GB14.01.2004
IE14.01.2004
LU14.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
Former [2005/23]AT16.07.2003
BE16.07.2003
CH16.07.2003
FI16.07.2003
LI16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
DK16.10.2003
GR16.10.2003
SE16.10.2003
DE17.10.2003
ES27.10.2003
PT16.12.2003
GB14.01.2004
IE14.01.2004
LU14.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
Former [2005/03]AT16.07.2003
BE16.07.2003
CH16.07.2003
FI16.07.2003
LI16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
DK16.10.2003
GR16.10.2003
SE16.10.2003
DE17.10.2003
ES27.10.2003
PT16.12.2003
GB14.01.2004
IE14.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
Former [2005/02]AT16.07.2003
BE16.07.2003
CH16.07.2003
FI16.07.2003
LI16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
DK16.10.2003
GR16.10.2003
SE16.10.2003
DE17.10.2003
ES27.10.2003
PT16.12.2003
GB14.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
Former [2005/01]AT16.07.2003
BE16.07.2003
CH16.07.2003
FI16.07.2003
LI16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
DK16.10.2003
GR16.10.2003
SE16.10.2003
DE17.10.2003
ES27.10.2003
PT16.12.2003
GB14.01.2004
Former [2004/46]AT16.07.2003
BE16.07.2003
CH16.07.2003
FI16.07.2003
LI16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
DK16.10.2003
GR16.10.2003
SE16.10.2003
DE17.10.2003
ES27.10.2003
PT16.12.2003
Former [2004/31]AT16.07.2003
BE16.07.2003
CH16.07.2003
FI16.07.2003
LI16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
DK16.10.2003
GR16.10.2003
SE16.10.2003
DE17.10.2003
PT16.12.2003
Former [2004/29]AT16.07.2003
BE16.07.2003
CH16.07.2003
FI16.07.2003
LI16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
DK16.10.2003
GR16.10.2003
SE16.10.2003
Former [2004/28]AT16.07.2003
BE16.07.2003
CH16.07.2003
FI16.07.2003
LI16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
GR16.10.2003
SE16.10.2003
Former [2004/22]AT16.07.2003
CH16.07.2003
FI16.07.2003
LI16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
GR16.10.2003
SE16.10.2003
Former [2004/16]AT16.07.2003
FI16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
GR16.10.2003
SE16.10.2003
Former [2004/14]AT16.07.2003
FI16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
GR16.10.2003
Former [2004/12]FI16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
Former [2004/10]NL16.07.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]US4983122  (MITNICK NEAL I [US]);
 [A]US5460527  (KITTELSEN JON D [US]);
 [A]US5320114  (KITTELSEN JON D [US], et al);
 [A]US5267862  (PARKER JONATHAN A [US])