Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1054430

EP1054430 - M-TYPE MICROWAVE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.01.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2009Change - representativepublished on 20.01.2010  [2010/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Makhov, Vladimir Iliich
1570 Four Mile Drive
Williamsoirt, PA 17701 / RU
[2000/47]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/47]
Representative(s)Ablett, Graham Keith , et al
Ablett & Stebbing
7-8 Market Place
London, W1W 8AG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/03]Ablett, Graham Keith , et al
Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street
London, W1U 6FQ / GB
Former [2000/47]Ablett, Graham Keith , et al
Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street
London W1M 1FD / GB
Application number, filing date99902010.005.01.1999
[2000/47]
WO1999RU00001
Priority number, dateRU1998010056008.01.1998         Original published format: RU 98100560
[2000/47]
Filing languageRU
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9935662
Date:15.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1054430
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999
[2000/47]
Search report(s)International search reportRU15.07.1999
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP14.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01J25/50, H01J23/05
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/47]
TitleGerman:MIKROWELLENANORDNUNG DES M-TYPS[2000/47]
English:M-TYPE MICROWAVE DEVICE[2000/47]
French:DISPOSITIF A MICRO-ONDES ET DE TYPE M[2000/47]
Entry into regional phase07.07.2000Translation filed 
04.08.2000National basic fee paid 
04.08.2000Search fee paid 
04.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
04.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: RU
04.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
01.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/09]
10.09.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2308224  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * * page 5, line 18 - page 6, line 20 * * page 13, line 3 - line 17 *;
 [A]WO9526039
 [A]  1, vol. 1995, no. 44, Database accession no. 1995-344778, XP002159313 [A] 1,5 * abstract *
International search[Y]RU94009675  ;
 [Y]RU2040821  (MAKHOV VLADIMIR ILICH [RU]);
 [Y]US5463271  (GEIS MICHAEL W [US], et al);
 [Y]US5382867  (YUJI MAROU [JP], et al)