Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1047548

EP1047548 - A METAL FOIL DISK FOR HIGH AREAL DENSITY RECORDING IN ENVIRONMENTS OF HIGH MECHANICAL SHOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.10.2009
Database last updated on 23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.11.2009  [2009/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Flextor Corporation
Suite 103, 1340 DeAnza Boulevard
San Jose, CA 95129 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
Flextor Inc.
Suite 103, 1340 DeAnza Boulevard
San Jose, CA 95129 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NIGAM, Anil
21451 Continental Circle
Saratoga, CA 95014 / US
02 / WHITE, James, W.
152 Milmar Way
Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Hirsch & Associés
137, rue de l'Université
75007 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]Cabinet Hirsch
34, Rue de Bassano
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99902247.814.01.1999
[2000/44]
WO1999US00792
Priority number, dateUS1998000745215.01.1998         Original published format: US 7452
[2000/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9936255
Date:22.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1047548
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999
[2000/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.07.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:B32B5/16, B32B9/00, B32B19/00, G11B5/33, G11B5/66, G11B5/70, G11B5/127, C23C14/00, C23C14/32, G11B5/64
[2002/50]
Former International [2000/44]B32B5/16, B32B9/00, B32B19/00, G11B5/33, G11B5/66, G11B5/70, G11B5/127, C23C14/00, C23C14/32
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/44]
TitleGerman:AUS EINER METTALFOLIE BESTEHENDE PLATTE ZUM AUFZEICHNEN MIT HOHER DICHTE IN EINEM UMFELD MIT HOHEN ERSCHÜTTERUNGEN[2000/44]
English:A METAL FOIL DISK FOR HIGH AREAL DENSITY RECORDING IN ENVIRONMENTS OF HIGH MECHANICAL SHOCK[2000/44]
French:DISQUE A FEUILLE METALLIQUE POUR ENREGISTREMENT A HAUTE DENSITE EN BITS/POUCE?2 DANS DES ENVIRONNEMENTS A CHOCS MECANIQUES ELEVES[2000/44]
Entry into regional phase16.08.2000National basic fee paid 
16.08.2000Search fee paid 
16.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
16.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
11.08.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
19.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.04.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/46]
08.06.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
31.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
31.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
31.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200911   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0817174  (TAKAHASHI MIGAKU [JP]) [X] 7,8 * page 2, line 12 - line 21 *;
 [X]JPS62293514  ;
 [X]JPS5387204  ;
 [A]US5707705  (NELSON CARL W [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 8, line 35 - line 41; claim 11 *;
 [PA]US5815343  (ISHIKAWA AKIRA [JP], et al) [PA] 1 * example 2 *;
 [A]JPH0773433  (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1;
 [A]US5536549  (NELSON CARL W [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 12, line 15 - line 22 * * column 3, line 50 - line 65 *
 [X]  1, vol. 1988, no. 05, Database accession no. 1988-033205, XP002216874 [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  1, vol. 1978, no. 36, Database accession no. 1978-64099A, XP002216875 [X] 1 * abstract *
International search[X]US5626970  (HEDGCOTH VIRGLE L [US]);
 [X]US5210673  (ITO MOTOYUKI [JP], et al);
 [X]US4745031  (NAKAYAMA MASATOSHI [JP], et al)