EP1045909 - Hm2 cDNA RELATED POLYPEPTIDES AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL, INC. 800 Capital Square, 400 Locust Street Des Moines, Iowa 50309 / US | For all designated states CURATORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MISSOURI 316 University Hall Columbia, MO 65211 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL, INC. 800 Capital Square, 400 Locust Street Des Moines, Iowa 50309 / US | ||
For all designated states CURATORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MISSOURI 316 University Hall Columbia, MO 65211 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRIGGS, Steven, P. 2454 Mango Way DelMar, CA 92014 / US | 02 /
JOHAL, Gurmukh 2212 Hillshire Court Columbia, MO 65203 / US | 03 /
MULTANI, Dilbag, Singh 552 Chris Drive Columbia, MO 65203 / US | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Bentham, Andrew J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/06] | Bentham, Andrew J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/43] | Goldin, Douglas Michael J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 99902305.4 | 15.01.1999 | [2000/43] | WO1999US00939 | Priority number, date | US19980071684P | 16.01.1998 Original published format: US 71684 P | [2000/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9936543 | Date: | 22.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1045909 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/29, C12N15/53, C12N15/82, C12N9/02, C07K14/415, A01H5/00, A01N65/00 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
C12N9/0004 (EP,US);
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
C12N15/8209 (EP,US);
C12N15/8282 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/43] | Title | German: | Hm2 cDNA VERWANDTE POLYPEPTIDE UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN | [2000/43] | English: | Hm2 cDNA RELATED POLYPEPTIDES AND METHODS OF USE | [2000/43] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES ASSOCIES A L'ADNc DU Hm2 ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION | [2000/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/43] | 08.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/36] | 29.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0866193 ; | [X]WO9413825 (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US]) [X] 1,3,4,7-10,14,15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9507989 (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US]) [X] 1,3,4,7-10,14,15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9723627 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7-10,14,15* page 33 - page 35 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 20, Database accession no. 96-195284, XP002100274 & JPH0866193 A 19960312 (NISSAN CHEM IND LTD) [X] 1,3,4,7-10,14,15 * abstract * | [X] - "Rice NADH-dependent reductase gene", GENESEQ ACCESSION NO. T13486, (19960913), XP002100273 [X] 1,3,4,7 |