Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1103041

EP1103041 - INTERFACE DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INTERFACING INSTRUMENTS TO MEDICAL PROCEDURE SIMULATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 22.11.2017  [2017/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Immersion Medical, Inc.
55 W. Watkins Mill Road
Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US
[2016/12]
Former [2003/29]For all designated states
Immersion Medical, Inc.
55 W. Watkins Mill Road
Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
HT Medical Systems, Inc.
55 W. Watkins Mill Road
Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ALEXANDER, David
15938 Woodgrove Road
Purcellville, VA 20132 / US
02 / BROWN, J., Michael
1759-1/2 R Street, N.W. 200
Washington, DC 20009 / US
03 / CABAHUG, Eric
12491 Lucas Drive
Fairfax, VA 22033 / US
04 / CHURCHILL, Philip, J.
17229 Emerson Drive
Silver Spring, MD 20905 / US
05 / COHEN, Robert, F.
3827 Gateway Terrace
Burtonsville, MD 20886 / US
06 / CUNNINGHAM, Richard, L.
630B South 15th Street
Arlington, VA 22202 / US
07 / FELDMAN, Ben
1632 Great Falls Street
McLean, VA 22101 / US
08 / FONTAYNE, Diego
1 Diamond Court
Montebello, NY 10901 / US
09 / MERRIL, Gregory, L.
4822 Leland Street
Chevy Chase, MD 20815 / US
10 / TURCHI, Mario
275 Leonia Avenue
Leonia, NJ 07605 / US
 [2001/22]
Representative(s)Phillips & Leigh LLP
Temple Chambers
3-7 Temple Avenue
London EC4Y 0DA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/12]Phillips & Leigh
5 Pemberton Row
London EC4A 3BA / GB
Former [2010/26]Phillips & Leigh
5 Pemberton Row
London EC4A 3BA / GB
Former [2009/48]Poulin, Gérard
Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2007/42]Poulin, Gérard
BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2001/22]Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date99902444.127.01.1999
[2001/22]
WO1999US01664
Priority number, dateUS19980072672P28.01.1998         Original published format: US 72672 P
US19980105661P26.10.1998         Original published format: US 105661 P
US19990116545P21.01.1999         Original published format: US 116545 P
[2001/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9939317
Date:05.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1103041
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999
[2001/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1103041
Date:23.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.08.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2009
ClassificationInternational:G09B23/28
[2001/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2016/12]
Former [2001/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:INSTRUMENTENSCHNITTSTELLE UND SIMULATIONSMETHODE FÜR MEDIZINISCHE VERFAHREN[2001/22]
English:INTERFACE DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INTERFACING INSTRUMENTS TO MEDICAL PROCEDURE SIMULATION SYSTEM[2001/22]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'INTERFACE ENTRE DES INSTRUMENTS ET UN SYSTEME DE SIMULATION DE PROCEDURE MEDICALE[2001/22]
Entry into regional phase28.08.2000National basic fee paid 
28.08.2000Search fee paid 
28.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.08.2000Examination requested  [2001/22]
15.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.2016Fee for grant paid
14.01.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.05.2009
Opposition(s)02.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
29.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
25.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
30.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
25.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
25.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
25.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 16
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 17
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 18
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
GR24.06.2016
PT25.07.2016
[2017/47]
Former [2017/07]AT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
GR24.06.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2017/03]AT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
GR24.06.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2016/52]AT23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
GR24.06.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2016/50]AT23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
GR24.06.2016
Former [2016/40]FI23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
GR24.06.2016
Former [2016/39]FI23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
GR24.06.2016
Former [2016/35]FI23.03.2016
GR24.06.2016
Documents cited:Search[PA]US5821920  (ROSENBERG LOUIS B [US], et al) [PA] 1-89 * column A; figures 1-7; claims 1-66 *;
 [AD]US5704791  (GILLIO ROBERT G [US]) [AD] 1-89 * column A; figures 1-15; claims 1-24 *;
 [AD]US4907973  (HON DAVID C [US]) [AD] 1-89 * column A; figures 1-10; claims 1-42 *;
 [AD]US4642055  (SALITERMAN STEVEN S [US]) [AD] 1-89 * column A; figures 1-18; claims 1-33 *;
 [AD]WO9502233  (CYBERNET SYSTEMS CORP [US]) [AD] 1-89 * abstract *
International search[T]US5821920  (ROSENBERG LOUIS B [US], et al);
 [T]US5800179  (BAILEY BRADFORD E [US]);
 [T]US5769640  (JACOBUS CHARLES J [US], et al);
 [T]US5766016  (SINCLAIR MICHAEL J [US], et al);
 [A]US5704791  (GILLIO ROBERT G [US]);
 [A]US4907973  (HON DAVID C [US]);
 [A]US5623582  (ROSENBERG LOUIS B [US]);
 [A]US4642055  (SALITERMAN STEVEN S [US])