Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1063910

EP1063910 - CONTAINER CAP FOR DRINK CONTAINERS, VALVE BODY INSERT PROVIDED THEREFOR, AND DRINK CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.08.2003  [2003/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bamed AG
Seestrasse 34
8852 Altendorf / CH
[2001/01]
Inventor(s)01 / RÖHRIG, Peter
Himmelschlüsselweg 3a
A-1160 Wien / AT
[2001/01]
Representative(s)Weinzinger, Arnulf , et al
Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte
Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2001/01]Weinzinger, Arnulf, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Köhler-Pavlik Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date99902447.404.02.1999
[2001/01]
WO1999AT00028
Priority number, dateAT1998000047618.03.1998         Original published format: AT 47698
[2001/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9947029
Date:23.09.1999
Language:DE
[1999/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1063910
Date:03.01.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999
[2001/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1063910
Date:04.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:A47G19/22, B65D47/20, F16K15/14
[2001/01]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2001/01]
TitleGerman:BEHÄLTERAUFSATZ FÜR EINEN TRINKBEHÄLTER, VENTILKÖRPEREINSATZ HIERFÜR UND TRINKBEHÄLTER[2001/01]
English:CONTAINER CAP FOR DRINK CONTAINERS, VALVE BODY INSERT PROVIDED THEREFOR, AND DRINK CONTAINERS[2001/01]
French:GARNITURE POUR UN RECIPIENT A BOISSON, ELEMENT DE CORPS DE SOUPAPE ET RECIPIENT A BOISSON CORRESPONDANTS[2001/01]
Entry into regional phase20.09.2000National basic fee paid 
20.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
20.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.09.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.09.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
27.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.06.2002Fee for grant paid
10.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]DE29706653U  (S & R KUNSTSTOFFTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6,9,19-22,24,26,28,29 * page 15, paragraph 1 - page 18, paragraph L; figure - *;
 [XA]US3949780  (BUCKMAN THOMAS P) [X] 20,21,28 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 52; figure - * [A] 1;
 [A]US5706973  (ROBBINS III EDWARD S [US], et al);
 [A]EP0064427  (MECANISMES COMP IND DE [FR])
ExaminationUS5687884
by applicantUS4545491
 US5542670
 US5079013
 GB2314497