Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972126

EP0972126 - IMPROVED HINGE WITH REMOVABLE PIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2003
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MULTIMATIC INC.
85 Valleywood Drive
Markham, Ontario L3R 5E5 / CA
[2000/44]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Gruber, Rudolf
1760 Central Street P.O. Box 1B7
Claremont, Ontario L1V 1B1 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Gruber, Rudolf
1760 Central Street, P.O. Box 1B7
Claremont Ontario L1V 1B1 / CA
 [2002/15]
Former [2000/03]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Lucking, David John , et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Lucking, David John , et al
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/44]Lucking, David John , et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Former [2000/03]Lucking, David John
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date99902482.129.01.1999
[2000/03]
WO1999CA00082
Priority number, dateCA1998222853903.02.1998         Original published format: CA 2228539
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9940281
Date:12.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972126
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972126
Date:10.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:E05D5/12
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTES SCHARNIER MIT AUSNEHMBAREM ZAPFEN[2000/03]
English:IMPROVED HINGE WITH REMOVABLE PIN[2000/03]
French:CHARNIERE AMELIOREE A AXE AMOVIBLE[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase26.10.1999National basic fee paid 
26.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
26.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
01.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.01.2002Fee for grant paid
03.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]FR2606822  (COMACI SA [FR]) [A] 1,6 * page 2, line 28 - page 4; figure - *;
 [A]US1516086  (JAMES DAVIDSON) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5033163
 US4542588