blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1057350 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1057350



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 345
16.01.2017 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
10.07.2002 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
26.07.2001 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.07.2001 Approval of request for amendments Search / examination 1
11.06.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
11.06.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
25.05.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
25.05.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 6
25.05.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
09.04.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
23.03.2001 Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
21.03.2001 Request for assignment Search / examination 14
21.03.2001 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 14
20.03.2001 Request for assignment Search / examination 7
05.03.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
16.02.2001 Description Search / examination 4
16.02.2001 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.02.2001 Drawings Search / examination 1
05.02.2001 Request for change of address of the applicant Search / examination 1
23.01.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
23.01.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.01.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 31
06.12.2000 Request for change of address of the applicant Search / examination 1
25.10.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.10.2000 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
18.10.2000 Claims Search / examination 3
25.09.2000 Request for change of address of the applicant Search / examination 1
20.09.2000 Request for accelerated examination Search / examination 1
14.08.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.07.2000 Request for change of address of the applicant Search / examination 1
17.07.2000 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
17.07.2000 Claims Search / examination 9
17.07.2000 Description Search / examination 8
17.07.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
26.06.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
09.06.2000 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.06.2000 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.06.2000 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
09.06.2000 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
09.06.2000 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
09.06.2000 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
09.06.2000 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.06.2000 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.06.2000 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
08.06.2000 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.06.2000 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
05.06.2000 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.03.2000 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 8
06.03.2000 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 8
06.03.2000 Description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
06.03.2000 Description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
06.03.2000 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 8
17.01.2000 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.01.2000 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
17.01.2000 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
29.11.1999 Non-unity - restrict claims/pay fees PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.11.1999 Non-unity - restrict claims/pay fees PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
28.10.1999 Copy of the corrected international search report Search / examination 10
28.10.1999 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 2
31.08.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
27.08.1999 Priority document Search / examination 38
24.08.1999 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
24.08.1999 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.08.1999 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.08.1999 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
12.08.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 34
23.06.1999 Urgent incoming letter International Searching Authority 2
26.05.1999 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 4
22.04.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
17.03.1999 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
23.02.1999 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
23.02.1999 Claims International Searching Authority 9
23.02.1999 Description International Searching Authority 21
23.02.1999 Drawings International Searching Authority 2