blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1057350


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.07.2002 No opposition filed within time limit published on  28.08.2002  [2002/35]
20.07.2001 (Expected) grant published on  05.09.2001 [2001/36]
05.06.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.04.2001 Change - applicant published on  23.05.2001 [2001/21]
28.02.2001 Communication of intention to grant
28.02.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.02.2001 Communication of intention to grant
19.01.2001 First examination report
18.01.2001 Communication of intention to grant
18.01.2001 Request for accelerated examination
21.12.2000 Renewal fee
01.11.2000 Amendment by applicant
21.10.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  06.12.2000 [2000/49]
21.10.2000 Request for examination filed published on  06.12.2000 [2000/49]
27.09.2000 Request for accelerated examination
09.08.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
26.07.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
25.07.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
15.05.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
09.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
03.09.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
20.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
10.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication