blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1057350
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1057350Global Dossier 05.09.2001B1
EP1057350 06.12.2000A2
Priority number Date
CH36798 16.02.1998
CH9900070 15.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT205352T 15.09.2001T
Priority number Date
CH36798 16.02.1998
CH9900070 15.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2262099 30.08.1999A
Priority number Date
CH36798 16.02.1998
CH9900070 15.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59900243D 11.10.2001D1
Priority number Date
CH36798 16.02.1998
CH9900070 15.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6543686 08.04.2003B1
Priority number Date
CH36798 16.02.1998
CH9900070 15.02.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9941919Global Dossier 28.10.1999A3
WO9941919 19.08.1999A2
Priority number Date
CH36798 16.02.1998