blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1057350

Designated contracting states AT 
 CH 
 DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 LI 
 NL 
Examination procedure25.05.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase17.07.2000National basic fee paid 
17.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
European patent granted05.09.2001
Opposition procedure06.06.2002No opposition filed within time limit published on 28.08.2002 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:06.12.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT CH DE FR GB LI NL
 
Event date:06.12.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000717
 
Event date:07.03.2001 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20010123
 
Event date:23.05.2001 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:SWISSCOM MOBILE AG
 
Event date:05.09.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT CH DE FR GB LI NL
 
Event date:05.09.2001 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:205352
Country of Ref Document:AT
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20010915
Kind Code of Ref Document:T
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:14.09.2001 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE
 
Event date:28.09.2001 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE
 
Event date:11.10.2001 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:59900243
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20011011
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:02.01.2002 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
Effective DATE:20011201
 
Event date:08.02.2002 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:28.08.2002 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:30.09.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PFA
Code Expl.: NAME/FIRM CHANGED
Owner Name:SWISSCOM (SCHWEIZ) AG
Free Format Text:SWISSCOM FIXNET AG#ALTE TIEFENAUSTRASSE 6 WORBLAUFEN / ITTIGEN#3050 BERN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SWISSCOM (SCHWEIZ) AG#ALTE TIEFENAUSTRASSE 6 WORBLAUFEN / ITTIGEN#3050 BERN (CH)
 
Event date:30.09.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PUE
Code Expl.: ASSIGNMENT
Owner Name:SWISSCOM AG
Free Format Text:SWISSCOM (SCHWEIZ) AG#ALTE TIEFENAUSTRASSE 6 WORBLAUFEN / ITTIGEN#3050 BERN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SWISSCOM AG#ALTE TIEFENAUSTRASSE 6 WORBLAUFEN / ITTIGEN#3050 BERN (CH)
 
Event date:30.09.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PUE
Code Expl.: ASSIGNMENT
Owner Name:SWISSCOM FIXNET AG
Free Format Text:SWISSCOM MOBILE AG#SCHWARZTORSTRASSE 61#3050 BERN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SWISSCOM FIXNET AG#ALTE TIEFENAUSTRASSE 6 WORBLAUFEN / ITTIGEN#3050 BERN (CH)
 
Event date:16.12.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
Free Format Text:REGISTERED BETWEEN 20091119 AND 20091125
 
Event date:01.02.2010 
Event description:NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS
Owner Name:SWISSCOM AG
Effective DATE:20091020
 
Event date:01.02.2010 
Event description:NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS
Owner Name:SWISSCOM FIXNET AG
Effective DATE:20091020
 
Event date:01.02.2010 
Event description:NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1
Owner Name:SWISSCOM (SCHWEIZ) AG
 
Event date:02.04.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
 
Event date:02.04.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME
 
Event date:15.03.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PFA
Code Expl.: NAME/FIRM CHANGED
Owner Name:SWISSCOM AG
Free Format Text:SWISSCOM AG#ALTE TIEFENAUSTRASSE 6 WORBLAUFEN / ITTIGEN#3050 BERN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SWISSCOM AG#ALTE TIEFENAUSTRASSE 6 WORBLAUFEN / ITTIGEN#3050 BERN (CH)
 
Event date:30.05.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20140212
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:15.10.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MM01 205352 AT T
Code Expl.:-LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES
Effective DATE:20150215
 
Event date:30.11.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150215
 
Event date:18.02.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:17.02.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:22.02.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.03.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20180216
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20180219
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20180216
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20180216
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.05.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20180222
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:15.02.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 59900243 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:20.02.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MK
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20190214
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:06.03.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20190214
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20190214