Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1057350

EP1057350 - IDENTIFICATION CARD AND BILLING PROCESS WITH AN IDENTIFICATION CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.07.2002
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.08.2002  [2002/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Swisscom Mobile AG
Schwarztorstrasse 61
3050 Bern / CH
[2001/21]
Former [2000/49]For all designated states
Swisscom AG
Alte Tiefenaustrasse 6
3050 Bern / CH
Inventor(s)01 / RITTER, Rudolf
Rossweidweg 8
CH-3052 Zollikofen / CH
[2000/49]
Representative(s)BOVARD AG
Patent- und Markenanwälte
Optingenstrasse 16
3013 Bern / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/49]BOVARD AG - Patentanwälte
Optingenstrasse 16
3000 Bern 25 / CH
Application number, filing date99902491.215.02.1999
[2000/49]
WO1999CH00070
Priority number, dateCH1998000036716.02.1998         Original published format: CH 36798
[2000/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9941919
Date:19.08.1999
Language:DE
[1999/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1057350
Date:06.12.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999
[2000/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1057350
Date:05.09.2001
Language:DE
[2001/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/32
[2000/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [2000/49]
TitleGerman:IDENTIFIZIERUNGSKARTE UND VERRECHNUNGSVERFAHREN MIT EINER IDENTIFIZIERUNGSKARTE[2000/49]
English:IDENTIFICATION CARD AND BILLING PROCESS WITH AN IDENTIFICATION CARD[2000/49]
French:CARTE D'IDENTIFICATION ET PROCEDE DE COMPENSATION AU MOYEN D'UNE CARTE D'IDENTIFICATION[2000/49]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2000National basic fee paid 
17.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
20.09.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
18.10.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.01.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
23.01.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
16.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
05.03.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.05.2001Fee for grant paid
25.05.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.06.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[DYA]WO9740616  (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR]) [DY] 1,2,32,44 * page 7, line 20 - page 15, line 4 * * page 23, line 9 - page 27, line 20; figures 2,3 * * page 16, line 15 - line 17; figure 1 * [A] 6,10,11,21,33,36,38,46;
 [Y]FR2613101  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 1,2,32,44 * abstract * * page 3, line 3 - line 16; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5487084  (LINDHOLM RUNE [FI]) [A] 1,32,44 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 11 *;
 [DA]EP0656733  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [DA] 21 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 19 *;
 [A]EP0186038  (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 21 * page 2, line 2 - line 25 *