Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1047409

EP1047409 - TTS CONTAINING AN ANTIOXIDANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.09.2003  [2003/36]
Applicant(s)For:BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  NL  PT  SE  CY 
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H.
Brunner Strasse 59
1235 Wien / AT
For all designated states
LTS LOHMANN Therapie-Systeme AG
Lohmannstrasse 2
56626 Andernach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]For:BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  NL  PT  SE  CY 
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H.
Brunner Strasse 59
1235 Wien / AT
For all designated states
LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG
Lohmannstrasse 2
56626 Andernach / DE
Former [2001/32]For:BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  NL  PT  SE  CY 
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H.
Brunner Strasse 59
1235 Wien / AT
For all designated states
LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG
Irlicher Strasse 55
56567 Neuwied / DE
Former [2000/44]For:BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  NL  PT  SE  CY 
Novartis AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H.
Brunner Strasse 59
1235 Wien / AT
For all designated states
LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG
Irlicher Strasse 55
56567 Neuwied / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ASMUSSEN, Bodo
Im Schlossgarten 10
D-56170 Bendorf-Sayn / DE
02 / HORSTMANN, Michael
Fürst-Friedrich-Karl-Strasse 9
D-56564 Neuwied / DE
03 / KÖPKE, Kai
Buchenweg 15
CH-6234 Triengen / CH
04 / TIEMESSEN, Harry
Dinkelbergstrasse 2
D-79576 Weil-Haltingen / DE
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Grubb, Philip William , et al
Novartis AG
Corporate Intellectual Property
Lichtstrasse 35
4002 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2003/20]Grubb, Philip William , et al
Novartis AG, Corporate Intellectual Property, Lichtstrasse 35
4002 Basel / CH
Former [2000/44]Becker, Konrad , et al
Novartis AG, Corporate Intellectual Property, Patent- und Trademark Department
4002 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date99902525.708.01.1999
[2000/44]
WO1999EP00078
Priority number, dateGB1998000052612.01.1998         Original published format: GB 9800526
[2000/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9934782
Date:15.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1047409
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999
[2000/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1047409
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/70, A61K31/325
[2000/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/44]
Extension statesRO29.05.2000
SI29.05.2000
TitleGerman:TTS ENTHALTEND EIN ANTIOXIDANS[2001/37]
English:TTS CONTAINING AN ANTIOXIDANT[2000/44]
French:SYSTEME TRANSDERMIQUE CONTENANT UN ANTIOXYDANT[2000/44]
Former [2000/44]TTS ENTHALTEND EIN ANTIOXIDANT
Entry into regional phase29.05.2000National basic fee paid 
29.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
29.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
15.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2002Fee for grant paid
16.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[DA]FR2611707  (SANDOZ SA [CH]) [DA] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [PA]WO9830243  (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al) [PA] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [PA]WO9831356  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al) [PA] 1-13 * the whole document *