Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1054830

EP1054830 - METHOD IN WINDING OF A WEB [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.03.2003
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.05.2003  [2003/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Metso Paper, Inc.
Fabianinkatu 9 A
00130 Helsinki / FI
[2001/34]
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
VALMET CORPORATION
Panuntie 6
00620 Helsinki / FI
Inventor(s)01 / LESKINEN, Arto
Vanha Hämeentie 892
FIN-05450 Nukari / FI
[2000/48]
Representative(s)Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois
TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99902561.202.02.1999
[2000/48]
WO1999FI00070
Priority number, dateFI1998000025204.02.1998         Original published format: FI 980252
[2000/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9940003
Date:12.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1054830
Date:29.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999
[2000/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1054830
Date:22.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:B65H18/02, B65H23/032
[2000/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/48]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM AUFWICKELN EINER BAHN[2000/48]
English:METHOD IN WINDING OF A WEB[2000/48]
French:PROCEDE D'ENROULEMENT D'UNE BANDE CONTINUE[2000/48]
Entry into regional phase31.07.2000National basic fee paid 
31.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
28.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2001Fee for grant paid
06.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.02.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]DE4408863  (KAMPF GMBH & CO MASCHF [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE1219576  (CONTINENTAL ELEKTRO IND AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0410093  (JAGENBERG AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3721969  (REIFENHAEUSER MASCH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2270903  (KLOECKNER ER WE PA GMBH [DE])