Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1078917

EP1078917 - AMIDINO DERIVATIVES AND DRUGS CONTAINING THE SAME AS THE ACTIVE INGREDIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.09.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.10.2004  [2004/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8526 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/09]For all designated states
ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8526 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SENOKUCHI, Kazuhiko, Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
1-1, Sakurai 3-chome, Shimamoto
Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP
02 / OGAWA, Koji, Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
1-1, Sakurai 3-chome, Shimamoto-cho
Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP
 [2001/09]
Representative(s)Bentham, Andrew , et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/09]Bentham, Andrew , et al
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date99902896.212.02.1999
[2001/09]
WO1999JP00622
Priority number, dateJP1998007681517.02.1998         Original published format: JP 7681598
[2001/09]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9941231
Date:19.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1078917
Date:28.02.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999
[2001/09]
Search report(s)International search reportJP19.08.1999
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP20.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07C257/18, A61K31/27, C07D309/04, A61K31/35, A61K31/41, C07D257/04, C07D213/78, C07D213/81, A61K31/44, C07D317/68, C07D307/78, C07D307/84, C07D307/22, C07D307/68, A61K31/34, A61K31/36, C07D239/36, A61K31/505, C07D333/38, C07D333/70, A61K31/38
[2001/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/09]
TitleGerman:AMIDINODERIVATE UND MEDIKAMENTE DIE DIESE ALS AKTIVEN BESTANDTEIL ENTHALTEN[2001/09]
English:AMIDINO DERIVATIVES AND DRUGS CONTAINING THE SAME AS THE ACTIVE INGREDIENT[2001/09]
French:DERIVES AMIDINO UTILISES COMME INGREDIENTS ACTIFS ET MEDICAMENTS LES CONTENANT[2001/09]
Entry into regional phase12.09.2000Translation filed 
12.09.2000National basic fee paid 
12.09.2000Search fee paid 
12.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
12.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
12.09.2000Examination requested  [2001/09]
10.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/44]
26.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed,
International search[A]DE1902475  (WOLFEN FILMFAB VEB);
 [A]WO9723212  (DU PONT MERCK PHARMA [US]);
 [A]US5342851  (SANFILIPPO PAULINE J [US], et al)