blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1047735

EP1047735 - METHOD OF PREPARING HYDROPHOBIC SILICA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.03.2004  [2004/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CABOT CORPORATION
Two Seaport Lane
Suite 1300
Boston, Massachusetts 02210-2019 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
CABOT CORPORATION
Two Seaport Lane, Suite 1300
Boston, Massachusetts 02210-2019 / US
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
Cabot Corporation
Billerica Technical Center, 157 Concord Road
Billerica, MA 01821-7001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MENON, Vinayan, C.
5908 Annapolis Rd N.E.
Albuquerque, NM 87111 / US
02 / SMITH, Douglas, M.
215 Richmond S.E.
Albuquerque, NM 87106 / US
03 / KOEHLERT, Kenneth, C.
96 Ice Pond Road
Carlisle, Massachusetts 01741 / US
[2001/01]
Former [2000/44]01 / MENON, Vinayan, C.
801 Locust Place N.E. 2060 H
Albuquerque, NM 87102 / US
02 / SMITH, Douglas, M.
215 Richmond S.E.
Albuquerque, NM 87106 / US
03 / KOEHLERT, Kenneth, C.
1210 Dorchester Drive
Champaign, IL 61821 / US
Representative(s)Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date99902974.713.01.1999
[2000/44]
WO1999US00161
Priority number, dateUS19980071080P15.01.1998         Original published format: US 71080 P
US19980071359P15.01.1998         Original published format: US 71359 P
[2000/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9936355
Date:22.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/29]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1047735
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1047735
Date:02.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:C09C1/30, C01B33/159, C01B33/18
[2000/44]
CPC:
C09C1/3081 (EP,US); C01B33/149 (EP,US); C01B33/159 (EP,US);
C01B33/18 (EP,US); C01P2002/87 (EP,US); C01P2002/88 (EP,US);
C01P2004/80 (EP,US); C01P2006/10 (EP,US); C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/90 (EP,US); Y10T428/2995 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/44]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HYDROPHOBER KIESELSÄURE[2000/44]
English:METHOD OF PREPARING HYDROPHOBIC SILICA[2000/44]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE SILICE HYDROPHOBE[2000/44]
Entry into regional phase28.07.2000National basic fee paid 
28.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
27.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
05.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
27.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.2003Fee for grant paid
02.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
10.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH02.04.2003
LI02.04.2003
SE02.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
[2004/05]
Former [2004/02]CH02.04.2003
LI02.04.2003
SE02.07.2003
Former [2003/41]SE02.07.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]GB682574  (DOW CORNING LTD) [A] 1-3,5-8,16-19,26-29 * page 1, column R, line 90 - page 2, column L, line 4 * * page 2, column L, line 50 - line 61 * * page 2, column R, line 79 - line 87 * * page 2, column R, line 100 - line 106 *;
 [A]US4054689  (CALVIN DONALD WILLIAM) [A] 1-4,8 * page 1, line 59 - page 2, line 10 * * claims 1-4,6,7 * * example 1 *;
 [A]US3948676  (LAUFER SIEGMAR) [A] 1,12-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB783868  (MIDLAND SILICONES LTD) [A] 1,10,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0251176  (TORAY SILICONE CO [JP]) [A] 1,2,20 * claims 1-6 * * page 2, line 41 - page 4, line 13 *;
 [A]EP0382370  (DOW CORNING [US]) [A] 1-5 * claims 1-7 * * page 2, line 1 - line 11 * * page 3, line 16 - page 4, line 39 *;
 [A]JPS61204113  ;
 [A]JPH02226066  ;
 [A]FR2078599  (ICI LTD)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870204), vol. 011, no. 038, Database accession no. (C - 401), & JP61204113 A 19860910 (KAO CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 42, Database accession no. 1990-316859, XP002119341 & JPH02226066 A 19900907 (NAKARAI TESK KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.