Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968546

EP0968546 - DOCKING-STYLE INTERMEDIATE CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.01.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.03.2003  [2003/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOLEX INCORPORATED
2222 Wellington Court Lisle
Illinois 60532-1682 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
MOLEX INCORPORATED
2222 Wellington Court
Lisle Illinois 60532-1682 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TAKASE, Hisato
1335-1-412 Zushi-machi
Machida-shi, Tokyo / JP
02 / ITO, Yoshikazu
2408-5 Kamiwada
Yamato-shi, Kanagawa / JP
03 / YAGI, Masanori
17-5-102 Kokubuminami 3-chome
Ebina-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Evans, Huw David Duncan
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Churchill House
Churchill Way
Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Evans, Huw David Duncan
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Three Trinity Court, 21-27 Newport Road
Cardiff CF2 1AA / GB
Application number, filing date99902984.615.01.1999
[2000/01]
WO1999US00186
Priority number, dateJP1998002045816.01.1998         Original published format: JP 2045898
JP1998002622711.09.1998         Original published format: JP 2622798
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9936995
Date:22.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968546
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.07.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01R9/09, H01R23/70, H01R23/72
[2002/38]
Former International [2000/01]H01R9/09
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:ANDOCKUNGSZWISCHENVERBINDER[2000/01]
English:DOCKING-STYLE INTERMEDIATE CONNECTOR[2000/01]
French:CONNECTEUR INTERMEDIAIRE D'ANCRAGE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase14.10.1999National basic fee paid 
14.10.1999Search fee paid 
14.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/11]
01.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/12]
12.09.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US5055069  (TOWNSEND PETER K [US], et al);
 [X]US5133679  (FUSSELMAN DAVID F [US], et al);
 [X]US5453016  (CLARK STEPHEN L [US], et al);
 [X]US5044975  (DIBENE II JOSEPH T [US], et al);
 [X]US5452975  (GRANT JERRY A [US])