Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1053541

EP1053541 - DECORATIVE SPEAKER COVER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2006Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 06.12.2006  [2006/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NCT Group, Inc.
1025 West Nursery Road
Linthicum, MD 21090-1206 / US
[2001/24]
Former [2000/47]For all designated states
NOISE CANCELLATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
1025 West Nursery Road
Linthicum, MD 21090-1203 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CLAYBAUGH, David
3044 O'Donnell Street
Baltimore, MD 21224 / US
02 / O'BRIEN, Sean
7017 Mathew Street
Greenbelt, MD 20770 / US
[2000/47]
Representative(s)Murray, Elisabeth Anne , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]Simons, Elisabeth Anne , et al
Mathys & Squire, 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date99902986.106.01.1999
[2000/47]
WO1999US00192
Priority number, dateUS19980070685P07.01.1998         Original published format: US 70685 P
[2000/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9935636
Date:15.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1053541
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999
[2000/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.07.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.08.2006
ClassificationInternational:G10K11/00, H04R1/02
[2006/26]
Former International [2000/47]G10K11/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/47]
TitleGerman:DEKORIERTE LAUTSPRECHERABDECKUNG[2000/47]
English:DECORATIVE SPEAKER COVER[2000/47]
French:REVETEMENT DECORATIF DE HAUT-PARLEUR[2000/47]
Entry into regional phase07.08.2000National basic fee paid 
07.08.2000Search fee paid 
07.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
07.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
26.10.2006Application withdrawn by applicant  [2006/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
10.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
05.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
09.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4936410  (HOWELL LES P [CA]) [Y] 1-3,7-9 * column 1, line 31 - column 3, line 12; figures 1-5 *;
 [Y]US4926962  (GRAHAM GARY T [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,7-9 * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 2; figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]GB2205213  (LINN PROD LTD) [Y] 1-3,7-9 * page 1, line 12 - page 2, line 36; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]DE29700596U  (MAGET STEFAN [DE]) [Y] 2 * page 4, column 1, line 17 - page 5, line 15; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4940622  (LEAVITT SR EDWARD J [US], et al) [A] 2 * column 2, line 18 - column 4, line 16; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]DE4326631  (WACKER HANS ULRICH DIPL ING [DE]) [Y] 3 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 45; figures 1-3; claim 1 *;
 [Y]US3696885  (GRIEG DONALD D, et al) [Y] 3 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 67; figures 1,2 *
International search[X]US4926962  (GRAHAM GARY T [US], et al)