EP1049789 - AN AUTOREGULATORY SYSTEM FOR VALIDATING MICROBIAL GENES AS POSSIBLE ANTIMICROBIAL TARGETS USING A TETRACYCLINE-CONTROLLABLE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US | [2005/18] |
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, Michigan 49001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUINN, Cheryl, L. 3010 Ridgeview Circle Kalamazoo, MI 49008 / US | 02 /
FORD, Charles, W. 1306 Carriage Place Portage, MI 49024 / US | [2000/45] | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | Perry, Robert Edward, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99903005.9 | 12.01.1999 | [2000/45] | WO1999US00371 | Priority number, date | US19980071640P | 16.01.1998 Original published format: US 71640 P | [2000/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9936554 | Date: | 22.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1049789 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/63, C12N15/90, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/04 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
C12N15/1034 (EP);
C12N15/635 (EP);
C12N15/90 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/45] | Extension states | AL | 14.07.2000 | LT | 14.07.2000 | LV | 14.07.2000 | MK | 14.07.2000 | RO | 14.07.2000 | SI | 14.07.2000 | Title | German: | SELBSTREGULIERTES SYSTEM ZUM TESTEN VON MIKROBIELLEN GENEN, WELCHE EIN MÖGLICHES ZIEL VON ANTIMIKROBIELLEN STOFFEN SIND, UNTER VERWENDUNG VON EINEM DURCH TETRAZYKLIN-REGULIERTEM ELEMENT | [2000/45] | English: | AN AUTOREGULATORY SYSTEM FOR VALIDATING MICROBIAL GENES AS POSSIBLE ANTIMICROBIAL TARGETS USING A TETRACYCLINE-CONTROLLABLE ELEMENT | [2000/45] | French: | SYSTEME AUTOREGULATEUR DE VALIDATION DE GENES MICROBIENS EN TANT QU'EVENTUELLES CIBLES ANTIMICROBIENNES UTILISANT UN ELEMENT REGULABLE PAR LA TETRACYCLINE | [2000/45] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 03.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/22] | 29.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/22] | Request for further processing for: | 23.09.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 22.09.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.10.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YDX]US5464758 (M. GOSSEN ET AL.) [YD] 1-58,60,62,63,65-77 * the whole document * [X] 59,61,64; | [YD]WO9640979 (MICROCIDE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.) [YD] 1-77 * the whole document *; | [YX]US5654168 (H. BUJARD ET AL.) [Y] 1-58,60,62,63,65-77 * the whole document * [X] 59,61,64; | [YX]WO9429442 (BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [Y] 1-58,60,62,63,65-77 * the whole document * [X] 59,61,64; | [Y]WO9601313 (DECONTI) [Y] 1-77 * the whole document *; | [YX]WO9640946 (YALE UNIVERSITY) [Y] 1-58,60,62,63,65-77 * the whole document * [X] 59,61,64; | [YX] - CAMILLI, ANDREW ET AL, "Use of genetic recombination as a reporter of gene expression.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (1994) VOL. 91, NO. 7, PP. 2634-2638. ISSN: 0027-8424., XP000197110 [Y] 1-58,60,62,65-77 * the whole document * [X] 59,61,64 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.7.2634 | [YX] - SKERRA, ARNE, "Use of the tetracycline promoter for the tightly regulated production of a murine antibody fragment in Escherichia coli.", GENE (AMSTERDAM), (1994) VOL. 151, NO. 1-2, PP. 131-135. ISSN: 0378-1119., XP004042624 [Y] 1-58,65-77 * the whole document * [X] 59-63 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(94)90643-2 | [YX] - RAMAKRISHNAN, GIRIJA ET AL, "A tetracycline -inducible gene expression system in Entamoeba histolytica.", MOLECULAR AND BIOCHEMICAL PARASITOLOGY, (1997) VOL. 84, NO. 1, PP. 93-100 ISSN: 0166-6851., XP002105109 [Y] 1-58,60,62,65-77 * the whole document * [X] 59,61,63,64 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0166-6851(96)02784-3 | [YX] - KIM, HONG-JIN ET AL, "Tetracycline repressor- regulated gene repression in recombinant human cytomegalovirus.", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (1995) VOL. 69, NO. 4, PP. 2565-2573. ISSN: 0022-538X., XP002037393 [Y] 1-58,60,62,63,65-77 * the whole document * [X] 59,61,64 | [YX] - M. GOSSEN ET AL., "Transcriptional activation by tetracycllines in mammalian cells.", SCIIENCE, (19950623), vol. 268, pages 1766 - 1769, XP002105110 [Y] 1-58,60,62,63,65-77 * the whole document * [X] 59,61,64 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.7792603 | [YX] - M. GOSSEN ET AL., "Tight control of gene expression in mammalian cells by tetracyline-responsive promoters.", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (199206), vol. 89, pages 5547 - 5551, XP000564458 [Y] 1-58,60,62,63,65-77 * the whole document * [X] 59,61,64 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.12.5547 | [AD] - W. HILLEN AND A. WISSMANN, Protein-Nucleic Acid Interaction; Tet repressor-tet operator interactions,, LONDON, SAEGER & HEINEMANN, EDS. MACMILLAN, (1989), XP002105116 [AD] * page 143 - page 162 * | [A] - M. NESIN ET AL., "Cloning and nucleotide sequence of a chromosomally encoded tetracycline resistacne determinant, tetA(M), from a Pathogenic, Methicilin-resistant strain of Staphylococcus aureus.", ANTIMICROBIAL AGNETS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (199011), vol. 34, no. 11, pages 2273 - 2276, XP002105111 [A] * the whole document * | [A] - T. NGUYEN ET AL., "Sequence homology between the tetracyline-resistance determinants of Tn10 and pBR322", GENE, (1983), vol. 25, pages 83 - 92, XP002105112 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(83)90170-1 | [A] - A. EAST ET AL., "Cloning and sequence determination of six Staphylococcus aureus beta-lactamases and their expression in Escherichia coli and Staphylococcus aureus.", JOURNAL OF GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY, (1989), vol. 135, pages 1001 - 1015, XP002067243 [A] * the whole document * | [PYX] - P GHERSA ET AL., "Highly controlled gene expression using combinations of tissue-specific promoter, recombinant adenovirus and a tetracycline-regulatable transcription factor.", GENE THERAPY, (199809), vol. 5, no. 9, pages 11213 - 1220, XP002105114 [PY] 1-58,60,62,63,65-77 * the whole document * [X] 59,61,64 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3300713 | [PYX] - F. YAO ET AL., "Tetracycline Repressor, tetR, rather than the tetR-Mammalian cell transcription factor fusion derivatives, regulates inducible gene expression in mammalian cells.", HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (19980901), vol. 9, no. 13, pages 1939 - 1950, XP002105115 [PY] 1-58,60,62,63,65-77 * the whole document * [X] 59,61,64 |