Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1055239

EP1055239 - ULTRASENSITIVE SURVEILLANCE OF SENSORS AND PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Arch Development Corporation
5801 S. Ellis Avenue, 5th Floor
Chicago, IL 60637 / US
[2006/18]
Former [2006/12]For all designated states
Arch Development Corporation
9700 South Cass Avenue
Argonne, IL 60639 / US
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
ARCH DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION
9700 South Cass Avenue
Argonne, IL 60639 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WEGERICH, Stephan, W.
133 Golfview
Glendale Heights, IL 60139 / US
02 / JARMAN, Kristin, K.
1513 S.E. Ogden Street
Richland, WA 99352 / US
03 / GROSS, Kenneth, C.
1433 Carriage Lane
Bolingbrook, IL 60440 / US
[2000/48]
Representative(s)Lawrence, John , et al
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]Lawrence, John , et al
Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date99903131.314.01.1999
[2000/48]
WO1999US00956
Priority number, dateUS1998000671314.01.1998         Original published format: US 6713
[2000/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9936920
Date:22.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1055239
Date:29.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999
[2000/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1055239
Date:22.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/12]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1055239
Date:07.06.2006
[2006/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.07.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:G21C7/00, G21C17/00, G05B23/00
[2002/24]
Former International [2000/48]G21C7/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/48]
TitleGerman:ULTRASENSITIVE ÜBERWACHUNG VON SENSOREN UND PROZESSEN[2000/48]
English:ULTRASENSITIVE SURVEILLANCE OF SENSORS AND PROCESSES[2000/48]
French:SURVEILLANCE ULTRASENSIBLE DE CAPTEURS ET DES PROCEDES[2005/31]
Former [2000/48]SURVEILLANCE ULTRASENSIBLE DE CAPTEURS ET DE PROCESSUS
Entry into regional phase03.08.2000National basic fee paid 
03.08.2000Search fee paid 
03.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
03.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
03.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
05.10.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.2005Fee for grant paid
23.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
07.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
19.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.03.2006
CH22.03.2006
CY22.03.2006
FI22.03.2006
LI22.03.2006
DK22.06.2006
SE22.06.2006
GR23.06.2006
PT22.08.2006
[2010/06]
Former [2008/29]AT22.03.2006
CH22.03.2006
FI22.03.2006
LI22.03.2006
DK22.06.2006
SE22.06.2006
GR23.06.2006
PT22.08.2006
Former [2008/21]AT22.03.2006
CH22.03.2006
LI22.03.2006
DK22.06.2006
SE22.06.2006
GR23.06.2006
PT22.08.2006
Former [2008/17]AT22.03.2006
CH22.03.2006
LI22.03.2006
DK22.06.2006
SE22.06.2006
PT22.08.2006
Former [2007/21]AT22.03.2006
CH22.03.2006
LI22.03.2006
DK22.06.2006
SE22.06.2006
PT22.08.2006
Former [2006/46]AT22.03.2006
CH22.03.2006
LI22.03.2006
SE22.06.2006
Former [2006/43]AT22.03.2006
CH22.03.2006
LI22.03.2006
Former [2006/42]CH22.03.2006
LI22.03.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9714105  (ARCH DEV CORP [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5459675  (GROSS KENNETH C [US], et al) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]WO9749011  (ARCH DEV CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [DA]US5410492  (GROSS KENNETH C [US], et al) [DA] 1 * column W *;
 [DA]US5223207  (GROSS KENNY C [US], et al) [DA] 1 * column W *;
 [A]  SINGER ET AL., "Model-based nuclear power plant monitoring and fault detection: theoretical foundations", INTELLIGENT SYSTEM APPLICATION TO POWER SYSTEMS (ISAP'97), Seoul, Korea, (1997), pages 60 - 65, XP001070043 [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  GROSS ET AL., "Application of a model-based fault detection system to nuclear plant signals", INTELLIGENT SYSTEM APPLICATION TO POWER SYSTEMS (ISAP'97), Seoul, Korea, (1997), pages 66 - 70, XP001070044 [A] 1 * the whole document *
International search[A]US5586066  (WHITE ANDREW M [US], et al);
 [A]US5629872  (GROSS KENNETH C [US], et al)