Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1047444

EP1047444 - METHODS OF NEUROENDOCRINE REGULATION OF AFFECTIVE DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.07.2002
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.08.2002  [2002/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center
330 Brookline Avenue
Boston, MA 02215 / US
For all designated states
THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, as represented by THE SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
The National Institute of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, 6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325
Rockville, MD 20852 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center
330 Brookline Avenue
Boston, MA 02215 / US
For all designated states
THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, as represented by THE SECRETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
National Institute of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, 6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325
Rockville, MD 20852-3804 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FLIER, Jeffrey, S.
14 Sylvan Avenue
West Newton, MA 02165 / US
02 / LICINO DE CASTRO PAIXAO, Julio
8315 North Brook Lane, 907
Bethesda, MD 20814 / US
03 / GOLD, Philip, W.
4621 Loverlock Place, N.W.
Washington, DC 20007 / US
04 / WONG, Ma-Li
8315 North Brook Lane, 907
Bethesda, MD 20814 / US
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Holdcroft, James Gerald , et al
Graham Watt & Co LLP
St Botolph's House
7-9 St Botolph's Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]Holdcroft, James Gerald, Dr. , et al
Graham Watt & Co., Riverhead
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB
Application number, filing date99903176.819.01.1999
[2000/44]
WO1999US01077
Priority number, dateUS1998000942920.01.1998         Original published format: US 9429
[2000/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9936083
Date:22.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1047444
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999
[2000/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/22
[2000/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/44]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZÜR NEUROENDOCRINER REGULIERUNG VON LAUNEKRANKHEITEN[2000/44]
English:METHODS OF NEUROENDOCRINE REGULATION OF AFFECTIVE DISORDERS[2000/44]
French:METHODE DE REGULATION NEURO-ENDOCRINIENNE PERMETTANT DE TRAITER LES TROUBLES AFFECTIFS[2000/44]
Entry into regional phase04.07.2000National basic fee paid 
04.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
04.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
06.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/35]
28.03.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[DA]US5552524  (BASINSKI MARGRET B [US], et al) [DA] 1-44 * column W *;
 [PX]WO9820894  (BETH ISRAEL HOSPITAL [US], et al) [PX] 1,15,18,25 * page 37 - page 41 *;
 [PX]WO9836767  (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [PX] 1,15,18,25 * the whole document *
 [DA]  - LICINIO J ET AL, "Human leptin levels are pulsatile and inversely related to pituitary-adrenal function [see comments].", NATURE MEDICINE, (1997 MAY) 3 (5) 575-9, XP002104581 [DA] 1-44 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm0597-575