Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1080390

EP1080390 - LINEAR ARRAY EYE TRACKER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.11.2005
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.11.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.01.2006  [2006/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VISX INCORPORATED
3400 Central Expressway
Santa Clara, CA 95051-0703 / US
[2001/10]
Inventor(s)01 / YEE, Kingman
1081 West Olive Avenue 4
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
 [2001/10]
Representative(s)Milhench, Howard Leslie , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/10]Milhench, Howard Leslie , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date99903237.820.01.1999
[2001/10]
WO1999US01222
Priority number, dateUS1998006387921.04.1998         Original published format: US 63879
[2001/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9954783
Date:28.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1080390
Date:07.03.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999
[2001/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.10.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:G03B9/10, A61F9/00, A61B3/113
[2002/21]
Former International [2001/10]G03B9/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/10]
TitleGerman:BLICKRICHTUNGSMESSUNG MIT LINEARER ANORDNUNG[2001/10]
English:LINEAR ARRAY EYE TRACKER[2001/10]
French:OCULOMETRE A BARRETTE[2001/10]
Entry into regional phase21.11.2000National basic fee paid 
21.11.2000Search fee paid 
21.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
21.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/10]
22.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/02]
12.08.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/02]
Request for further processing for:24.02.2004Request for further processing filed
24.02.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.03.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
10.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
05.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE4232021  (AUGON GES FUER DIE ENTWICKLUNG [DE]) [Y] 1-23 * column 3, line 7 - line 54 *;
 [Y]EP0770370  (IR VISION INC [US]) [Y] 1-23 * column 14, paragraph 3 - column 18, paragraph 1; figure 6 *;
 [A]WO9418883  (PHOENIX LASER SYSTEMS INC [US]);
 [A]WO9308877  (LAI SHUI T [US]) [A] * page 44, paragraph 1; figure 4C *
International search[A]US4169663  (MURR WILLIAM C [US])