Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1051459

EP1051459 - HYDRODESULFURISATION OF GAS WELL HYDROCARBON LIQUIDS USING HYDROGEN PRODUCED FROM SYNGAS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  13.03.2009
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 12.08.2015  [2015/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900
Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900
Annandale NJ 08801-0900 / US
Former [2002/16]For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East, Clinton Township
Annandale, New Jersey 08801 / US
Former [2001/01]For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East, Clinton Township
Annandale, New Jersey 08801 / US
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY
P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue
Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WITTENBRINK, Robert, Jay
6018 Riverchase Trail
Kingwood, TX 77345 / US
02 / DeGEORGE, Charles, William
208 North Road
Chester, NJ 07930 / US
 [2001/14]
Former [2000/46]01 / WITTENBRINK, Robert, Jay
836 Shadyglen Drive
Baton Rouge, LA 70816 / US
02 / DeGEORGE, Charles, William
208 North Road
Chester, NJ 07930 / US
Representative(s)Dew, Melvyn John , et al
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc.
IP Law Europe
Hermeslaan 2
1831 Machelen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]Dew, Melvyn John , et al
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. Law Technology P.O.Box 105
1830 Machelen / BE
Application number, filing date99903267.522.01.1999
[2000/46]
WO1999US01308
Priority number, dateUS1998001417527.01.1998         Original published format: US 14175
[2000/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9937736
Date:29.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1051459
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999
[2000/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1051459
Date:17.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/16]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1051459
Date:15.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/16]
Search report(s)International search reportEP29.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:C10G45/02, C10L3/06
[2000/46]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/46]
TitleGerman:HYDRODESULFURIERUNG VON FLÜSSIGEN KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN AUS EINER GAS-QUELLE MIT VERWENDUNG VON AUS SYNTHESEGAS PRODUZIERTEM WASSERSTOFF[2009/01]
English:HYDRODESULFURISATION OF GAS WELL HYDROCARBON LIQUIDS USING HYDROGEN PRODUCED FROM SYNGAS[2000/46]
French:HYDRODESULFURATION DE LIQUIDES HYDROCARBONES DE PUITS DE GAZ PAR L'UTILISATION D'HYDROGENE OBTENU A PARTIR DE GAZ DE SYNTHESE[2000/46]
Former [2000/46]HYDRODESULFURIERUNG VON GAS-QUELLE KOHLENWASSERSTOFFFLÜSSIGKEITEN MIT VERWENDUNG VON AUS SYNTHESEGAS PRODUZIERTEM WASSERSTOFF
Entry into regional phase23.08.2000National basic fee paid 
23.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
23.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
07.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
14.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
14.01.2002Fee for grant paid
14.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.01.2003  17.09.2008  WITHDRAWN
SASOL Technology (Pty) Ltd.
PO Box 1, Klasie Havenga Road
Sasolburg 1947 / ZA
Opponent's representative
Kador & Partner
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/51]
Opponent(s)01  16.01.2003  17.09.2008  WITHDRAWN
SASOL Technology (Pty) Ltd.
PO Box 1, Klasie Havenga Road
Sasolburg 1947 / ZA
Opponent's representative
Kador & Partner
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
Former [2003/11]
Opponent(s)01  16.01.2003   
SASOL Technology (Pty) Ltd.
PO Box 1, Klasie Havenga Road
Sasolburg 1947 / SA
Opponent's representative
Kador & Partner
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
05.03.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.09.2003Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.03.2007Date of oral proceedings
22.05.2007Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
22.05.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.10.2008Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.12.2008Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
04.03.2009Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition23.07.2007Appeal received No.  T1261/07
24.09.2007Statement of grounds filed
10.10.2008Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn
16.07.2007Appeal received
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
10.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200103   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL17.04.2002
SE23.01.2009
BE31.01.2009
[2015/33]
Former [2012/41]NL17.04.2002
SE23.01.2009
Former [2010/06]NL17.04.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]US4413153  (GARWOOD WILLIAM E [US], et al) [A] 1,5,11 * claims 1-3,7 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4358364  (KLOSEK JOSEPH, et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * column 4, line 28 - line 36 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9703149  (CHEMICAL RES & LICENSIN [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * page 6, line 15 - line 19 *;
 [DA]US5260239  (HSIA STEPHEN J [US]) [DA] 1,5-7,14;
 [A]US2609382  (MAYLAND BERTRAND J) [A] 1-3,5,6,8,11,12,14,15 * the whole document *
OppositionUS5292428
 US5637259
 US3753894
 US3720602
 US4272357
 EP0875284
 ZA855317
 US5545674
 US5292705
 US5348982
 US5283216
 US5268344
    - ""Fixed-bed reactor successful in fuels from coal synthesis"", OIL & GAS JOURNAL, (19920120), no. 5909, pages 53 - 56,
    - DEWETT H. ET AL, POST-COMMISSIONING OPERATING EXPERIENCE AT THE MOSSGAS..., SAN FRANCISCO, (19970922), no. 2B,
    - ""Catalytic reforming...", JAMES H. GARY; GLENN E. HANDWERK, Petroleum Refining, DEKKER, page CHAP.10, ISBN 0-8247-9157-6,
    - BARBARA ELVERS ET AL, Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Ind.Ch, vol. A13, pages 400 - 407,
    - PROF.DR. HANS SCHULZ ET AL, Kohle, Fischer-Tropsch-Synthese, VERLAG CHEMIE, vol. 14,
    - ABRARDO J.M.; CURANA V., Hyrogen Technologies to meet..., pages 43 - 47,
    - CHOI G.N. ET AL, "Design/Economics of a Once-Through Natural Gas Fischer-Tropsc Plant with Power Co-production", REPORT OF THE US DEPART. OF ENERGY (DOE), (1997),
    - ULLMANN'ENCYCLOPEDIA OF IND. CHEMISTRY, Natural Gaz Processing, BARBARA ELVERS ET AL., vol. 17,