Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1048188

EP1048188 - DEMAND ANTICIPATION CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A HIGH EFFICIENCY ULTRA-PURE FLUID HEATER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.04.2005
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tom Richards, Inc.
7010 Lindsay Drive
Mentor, Ohio 44061 / US
[2002/02]
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
Lufran Incorporated
10200 Wellman Road
Streetsboro, OH 44241 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ZENIOS, Theofani
435 N. Osborn
Youngstown, OH 44509 / US
02 / BASE, Howard, J.
938 Florence Drive
Macedonia, OH 44506 / US
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Shindler, Nigel
Brookes Batchellor LLP
1 Boyne Park
Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]Shindler, Nigel
BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 102-108 Clerkenwell Road
London EC1M 5SA / GB
Application number, filing date99903327.722.01.1999
[2000/44]
WO1999US01430
Priority number, dateUS19980072321P23.01.1998         Original published format: US 72321 P
[2000/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9938356
Date:29.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1048188
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999
[2000/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1048188
Date:26.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.07.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:H05B3/04, H05B1/02, H05B3/82, F24H1/10, F24H9/20, G05D23/24
[2002/34]
Former International [2000/44]H05B3/04, H05B1/02, H05B3/82, F24H1/10, F24H9/20
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/44]
TitleGerman:STEUERUNGSSYSTEM MIT VORZEITIGER BEFRAGUNG FÜR EINE ERHITZUNGSVORRICHTUNG BESTIMMT FÜR DIE ERWÄRMUNG VON ULTRAREINEN FLÜSSIGKEITEN.[2000/44]
English:DEMAND ANTICIPATION CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A HIGH EFFICIENCY ULTRA-PURE FLUID HEATER[2000/44]
French:SYSTEME DE COMMANDE A DEMANDE ANTICIPEE POUR DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE DE FLUIDES ULTRA-PURS A HAUT RENDEMENT[2000/44]
Entry into regional phase22.08.2000National basic fee paid 
22.08.2000Search fee paid 
22.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
28.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.03.2004Fee for grant paid
19.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
10.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
05.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE26.05.2004
CH26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
NL26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
PT26.10.2004
CY22.01.2005
LU22.01.2005
IE24.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
[2008/17]
Former [2007/21]BE26.05.2004
CH26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
NL26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
CY22.01.2005
LU22.01.2005
IE24.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
Former [2006/24]BE26.05.2004
CH26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
NL26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
IE24.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
Former [2006/14]BE26.05.2004
CH26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
NL26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
MC31.01.2005
Former [2006/13]BE26.05.2004
CH26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
NL26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
Former [2005/18]BE26.05.2004
CH26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
Former [2005/14]BE26.05.2004
CH26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
Former [2005/06]CH26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
Former [2005/02]CH26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
Former [2004/52]CH26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
SE26.08.2004
Former [2004/51]CH26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5438642  (POSEN ALAN [US]) [Y] 1-20 * column 1, line 44 - column 4, line 25; figures 1-7 *;
 [Y]WO9602029  (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [Y] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US4835365  (ETHERIDGE DAVID R [US]) [Y] 2-5,8,11-13,18 * column 2, line 42 - column 10, line 59; figures 1,2,4,7 *;
 [Y]US5339687  (GIMSON CHRISTOPHER J [GB], et al) [Y] 3-5,11-13,18 * column 1, line 4 - column 10, line 24; figures 5-7 *;
 [Y]US5396574  (BASE HOWARD J [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 59 - column 9, line 18; figures 1,3,5 *
International search[X]US4835365  (ETHERIDGE DAVID R [US]);
 [Y]US4553024  (FINDLAY GORDON R [US]);
 [Y]US5396574  (BASE HOWARD J [US], et al)