Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1051792

EP1051792 - CLAMPING APPARATUS FOR TURBINE GENERATOR COIL WINDINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.12.2003  [2003/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Westinghouse Power Corporation
4400 Alafaya Trail, MC 301
Orlando, FL 32826-2399 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
Siemens Westinghouse Power Corporation
4400 Alafaya Trail, MC 301
Orlando, FL 32826-2399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ROWE, Charles, M.
4274 Peacham Court
Orlando, FL 32817 / US
02 / CHRISTODOULOU, Alex
2648 Fallbrook Drive
Oviedo, FL 32765 / US
03 / WELTZIEN, Thorsten
12907 Maribou circle
Orlando, FL 32828 / US
 [2001/12]
Former [2000/46]01 / ROWE, Charles, M.
4274 Peacham Court
Orlando, FL 32817 / US
02 / CHRISTODOULOU, Alex
2648 Fallbrook Drive
Oviedo, FL 32765 / US
03 / WELTZIEN, Thorsten
4715 Walden Circle 606
Orlando, FL 32811 / US
Representative(s)Payne, Janice Julia
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/35]Payne, Janice Julia
Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2000/46]Allen, Derek
Siemens Shared Services Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Siemens House, Oldbury
Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB
Application number, filing date99903336.825.01.1999
[2000/46]
WO1999US01443
Priority number, dateUS1998001317426.01.1998         Original published format: US 13174
[2000/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9938243
Date:29.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1051792
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999
[2000/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1051792
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:H02K3/50
[2000/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/46]
TitleGerman:KLEMMVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE WICKLUNGSSPULEN VON TURBOGENERATOREN[2000/46]
English:CLAMPING APPARATUS FOR TURBINE GENERATOR COIL WINDINGS[2000/46]
French:APPAREIL DE BLOCAGE POUR ENROULEMENTS DE BOBINE DE TURBOGENERATEUR[2000/46]
Entry into regional phase08.08.2000National basic fee paid 
08.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
08.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
15.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.09.2002Fee for grant paid
09.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US4782579  (ROWE CHARLES M [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4-7,9,13,15-17,21,23,24,28,35 * column 3, line 33 - column 6, line 68; figure - *;
 [AD]US4563607  (COOPER GLENN D [US], et al) [AD] 1,5,6,9,16,17,24,35 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4950934  (HOLLY III HENRY M [US]) [A] 1,5,6,9,16,17,24,35 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 29; figures 2,3 *