blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1053055 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1053055



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 299
07.06.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
20.06.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.05.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.05.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
28.05.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
17.02.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
17.02.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
17.02.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 42
21.01.2003 Claims Search / examination 5
21.01.2003 Description Search / examination 11
21.01.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
16.01.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 19
08.01.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.12.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.12.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.08.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
27.08.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.03.2001 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
11.12.2000 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Appeal 1
22.11.2000 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
11.10.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
05.10.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.10.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.10.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.10.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.07.2000 Claims Search / examination 4
28.07.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
21.03.2000 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.03.2000 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.03.2000 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
21.03.2000 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
21.03.2000 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
21.03.2000 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
21.03.2000 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.03.2000 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.02.2000 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
15.02.2000 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
15.02.2000 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
17.11.1999 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
09.11.1999 Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.10.1999 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.10.1999 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
30.08.1999 Document concerning representation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
30.08.1999 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
23.08.1999 Priority document Search / examination 52
12.08.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
26.07.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
26.07.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 42
22.02.1999 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
22.02.1999 Claims International Searching Authority 4
22.02.1999 Description International Searching Authority 21
22.02.1999 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
22.02.1999 Drawings International Searching Authority 14