Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1053055 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP00121275 EP00918506 EP00951038 EP00976960 EP01106838 EP01106840 EP01106841 EP01106846 EP01988251 EP05000630

More

EP92925225 EP95900430 EP95923691 EP95925571 EP95931746 EP96930748 EP97934013 EP97935246 EP97938378 EP97950750 EP97950814 EP98961847 EP99903423 EP99908135 EP99908154 EP99968558



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO9943853Global Dossier 11.11.1999A9
WO9943853 02.09.1999A1
Priority number Date
US3015698 25.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO9942558Global Dossier 26.08.1999A1
Priority number Date
US23959899 29.01.1999
US24093199 29.01.1999
US24092099 29.01.1999
US24048999 29.01.1999
US2661898 20.02.1998
US23956999 29.01.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO9929711Global Dossier 17.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
US98606597 05.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO9851819Global Dossier 25.03.1999A9
WO9851819 19.11.1998A1
Priority number Date
US85505897 14.05.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO9849543Global Dossier 05.11.1998A1
Priority number Date
US84687697 01.05.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO9828320Global Dossier 26.11.1998A3
WO9828320 02.07.1998A2
Priority number Date
US76093396 06.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO9824544Global Dossier 11.06.1998A1
Priority number Date
US75396296 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO9810277Global Dossier 12.03.1998A1
Priority number Date
US70935896 06.09.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO9810273Global Dossier 12.03.1998A1
Priority number Date
US70826296 06.09.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO9801758Global Dossier 15.01.1998A1
Priority number Date
US67730596 09.07.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO9712030Global Dossier 03.04.1997A1
Priority number Date
US53445495 27.09.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO9607917Global Dossier 14.03.1996A1
Priority number Date
US30465794 09.09.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO9601836Global Dossier 25.01.1996A1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO9534890Global Dossier 21.12.1995A1
Priority number Date
US25816894 10.06.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO9512808Global Dossier 11.05.1995A1
Priority number Date
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO9309128Global Dossier 13.05.1993A1
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO0246363Global Dossier 15.08.2002A3
WO0246363 13.06.2002A2
Priority number Date
US71020000 09.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO0173122Global Dossier 04.10.2001A1
Priority number Date
US0008432 28.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO0153799Global Dossier 26.07.2001A1
Priority number Date
US48985500 24.01.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO0134765Global Dossier 16.05.2002A9
WO0134765 17.05.2001A1
Priority number Date
US43631199 08.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO0106496Global Dossier 25.01.2001A1
Priority number Date
US35493199 15.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO0061805Global Dossier 19.10.2000A1
Priority number Date
US29012999 12.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO0037163Global Dossier 29.06.2000A1
Priority number Date
US11373098 23.12.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO0032744Global Dossier 23.11.2000A9
WO0032744 08.06.2000A1
Priority number Date
US20372598 02.12.1998
US20393598 02.12.1998
US20432498 02.12.1998
US20373098 02.12.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2007055453Global Dossier 08.03.2007A1
Priority number Date
US29692705 08.12.2005
US62308003 18.07.2003
US85505897 14.05.1997
US49686400 02.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2007042386Global Dossier 22.02.2007A1
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
US9209827 06.11.1992
US23223394 05.05.1994
US72475300 28.11.2000
US70360196 23.08.1996
US17051405 28.06.2005
US99737401 29.11.2001
US12363898 28.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2004209355Global Dossier 21.10.2004A1
Priority number Date
US48985500 24.01.2000
US43631199 08.11.1999
US77274404 04.02.2004
US76093396 06.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2004115696Global Dossier 17.06.2004A1
Priority number Date
US63225503 31.07.2003
US76093396 06.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2004086917Global Dossier 06.05.2004A1
Priority number Date
US62308003 18.07.2003
US53445495 27.09.1995
US85505897 14.05.1997
US49686400 02.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2004077074Global Dossier 22.04.2004A1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US30465794 09.09.1994
US68644003 14.10.2003
US20432498 02.12.1998
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US75396296 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2003162214Global Dossier 28.08.2003A1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US37106603 21.02.2003
US49096500 24.01.2000
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8630807Global Dossier 14.01.2014B2
US2006216740 28.09.2006A1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US43631199 08.11.1999
US30465794 09.09.1994
US40171306 11.04.2006
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US33745003 06.01.2003
US76093396 06.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8313940Global Dossier 20.11.2012B2
US2008203502 28.08.2008A1
Priority number Date
US72597696 04.10.1996
US96331707 21.12.2007
US12871898 04.08.1998
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8114589Global Dossier 14.02.2012B2
US2007178516 02.08.2007A1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US72652007 22.03.2007
US30465794 09.09.1994
US70826296 06.09.1996
US44453999 22.11.1999
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US98606597 05.12.1997
US17017202 11.06.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7947486Global Dossier 24.05.2011B2
US2010173792 08.07.2010A1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US70235307 05.02.2007
US49096500 24.01.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7858034Global Dossier 28.12.2010B2
US2008019872 24.01.2008A1
Priority number Date
US23959899 29.01.1999
US27188294 07.07.1994
US72597696 04.10.1996
US77572407 10.07.2007
US30465794 09.09.1994
US85964497 20.05.1997
US70935896 06.09.1996
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US2661898 20.02.1998
US75396296 04.12.1996
US84912201 04.05.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7857957Global Dossier 28.12.2010B2
US2008047832 28.02.2008A1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US47044899 22.12.1999
US30465794 09.09.1994
US70241707 05.02.2007
US70935896 06.09.1996
US98606597 05.12.1997
US16383502 05.06.2002
US1659698 30.01.1998
US11373098 23.12.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7704726Global Dossier 27.04.2010B2
US2007054299 08.03.2007A1
Priority number Date
US59786600 20.06.2000
US27188294 07.07.1994
US30465794 09.09.1994
US50567906 17.08.2006
US14128698 27.08.1998
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7601301Global Dossier 13.10.2009B2
US2007095671 03.05.2007A1
Priority number Date
US36467699 30.07.1999
US8112305 15.03.2005
US90311001 10.07.2001
US67730596 09.07.1996
US14303702 07.05.2002
US63968806 15.12.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7150997Global Dossier 19.12.2006B2
US2005155863 21.07.2005A1
Priority number Date
US36467699 30.07.1999
US8112305 15.03.2005
US90311001 10.07.2001
US67730596 09.07.1996
US14303702 07.05.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7101717Global Dossier 05.09.2006B2
US2004149582 05.08.2004A1
Priority number Date
US36467699 30.07.1999
US90311001 10.07.2001
US67730596 09.07.1996
US76404104 23.01.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7060224Global Dossier 13.06.2006B2
US2003146095 07.08.2003A1
Priority number Date
US43631199 08.11.1999
US33745003 06.01.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20050044938Global Dossier 13.05.2005A
Priority number Date
US76093396 06.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20030014345Global Dossier 17.02.2003A
Priority number Date
US43631199 08.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20010041147Global Dossier 15.05.2001A
Priority number Date
US23959899 29.01.1999
US24093199 29.01.1999
US24092099 29.01.1999
US24048999 29.01.1999
US9903080 11.02.1999
US2661898 20.02.1998
US23956999 29.01.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20010032789Global Dossier 25.04.2001A
Priority number Date
US9825475 01.12.1998
US98606597 05.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2008146805Global Dossier 26.06.2008A
Priority number Date
US76093396 06.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2007057540Global Dossier 08.03.2007A
Priority number Date
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2007020568Global Dossier 01.02.2007A
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2004524823Global Dossier 19.08.2004A
Priority number Date
US71020000 09.11.2000
US0146128 30.10.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2003524750Global Dossier 19.08.2003A
Priority number Date
US23959899 29.01.1999
US24093199 29.01.1999
US24092099 29.01.1999
US24048999 29.01.1999
US9903080 11.02.1999
US2661898 20.02.1998
US23956999 29.01.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2003505046Global Dossier 12.02.2003A
Priority number Date
US35493199 15.07.1999
US0040181 09.06.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002541823Global Dossier 10.12.2002A
Priority number Date
US29012999 12.04.1999
US0008432 28.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002536962Global Dossier 05.11.2002A
Priority number Date
US9931098 22.12.1999
US11373098 23.12.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002519998Global Dossier 09.07.2002A
Priority number Date
US9903175 12.02.1999
US3015698 25.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002502047Global Dossier 22.01.2002A
Priority number Date
US9901651 26.01.1999
US1659698 30.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002501611Global Dossier 15.01.2002A
Priority number Date
US9721898 26.11.1997
US75396296 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2001525921Global Dossier 11.12.2001A
Priority number Date
US9710997 24.06.1997
US67730596 09.07.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2001525193Global Dossier 11.12.2001A
Priority number Date
US9825475 01.12.1998
US98606597 05.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2001506931Global Dossier 29.05.2001A
Priority number Date
US9722171 26.11.1997
US76093396 06.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2001500966Global Dossier 23.01.2001A
Priority number Date
US70935896 06.09.1996
US9713525 31.07.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JPH11512605Global Dossier 02.11.1999A
Priority number Date
US53445495 27.09.1995
US9614353 06.09.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JPH10505497Global Dossier 02.06.1998A
Priority number Date
US9511333 06.09.1995
US30465794 09.09.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JPH09504910Global Dossier 13.05.1997A
Priority number Date
US9412270 26.10.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JPH09503307Global Dossier 31.03.1997A
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US9508570 05.07.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4334798BGlobal Dossier 30.09.2009B2
JP2004500247 08.01.2004A
Priority number Date
US43631199 08.11.1999
US0030480 03.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4213216BGlobal Dossier 21.01.2009B2
JP2001501301 30.01.2001A
Priority number Date
US9714489 18.08.1997
US70826296 06.09.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4026847BGlobal Dossier 26.12.2007B2
JPH10504925 12.05.1998A
Priority number Date
US25816894 10.06.1994
US9506999 07.06.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3509859BGlobal Dossier 22.03.2004B2
JPH07502992 30.03.1995A
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
US9209827 06.11.1992
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1524695Global Dossier 28.01.2009A3
EP1524695 20.04.2005A2
Priority number Date
EP97950814 26.11.1997
US76093396 06.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1341932Global Dossier 23.11.2005A4
EP1341932 10.09.2003A2
Priority number Date
US71020000 09.11.2000
US0146128 30.10.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1230340Global Dossier 20.07.2011B1
EP1230340 21.05.2003A4
EP1230340 14.08.2002A1
Priority number Date
US43631199 08.11.1999
US0030480 03.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1204853Global Dossier 12.04.2006A4
EP1204853 15.05.2002A1
Priority number Date
US35493199 15.07.1999
US0040181 09.06.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1173611Global Dossier 15.01.2003A4
EP1173611 23.01.2002A1
Priority number Date
US29012999 12.04.1999
US0008432 28.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1144092Global Dossier 29.10.2002A4
EP1144092 17.10.2001A1
Priority number Date
US9931098 22.12.1999
US11373098 23.12.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1120469Global Dossier 24.10.2001A3
EP1120469 01.08.2001A2
Priority number Date
EP95900430 26.10.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1120157Global Dossier 24.10.2001A3
EP1120157 01.08.2001A2
Priority number Date
EP95900430 26.10.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1120156Global Dossier 24.10.2001A3
EP1120156 01.08.2001A2
Priority number Date
EP95900430 26.10.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1120155Global Dossier 24.10.2001A3
EP1120155 01.08.2001A2
Priority number Date
EP95900430 26.10.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1067134Global Dossier 28.07.2004B1
EP1067134 02.05.2001A3
EP1067134 10.01.2001A2
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
EP92925225 06.11.1992
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1056887Global Dossier 31.05.2006B1
EP1056887 28.08.2002A4
EP1056887 06.12.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9903175 12.02.1999
US3015698 25.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1054949Global Dossier 27.09.2006A4
EP1054949 29.11.2000A1
Priority number Date
US23959899 29.01.1999
US24093199 29.01.1999
US24092099 29.01.1999
US24048999 29.01.1999
US9903080 11.02.1999
US2661898 20.02.1998
US23956999 29.01.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1036085Global Dossier 17.11.2004A4
EP1036085 20.09.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9825475 01.12.1998
US98606597 05.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1019711Global Dossier 13.06.2001A4
EP1019711 19.07.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9714489 18.08.1997
US70826296 06.09.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0961652Global Dossier 08.12.1999A1
Priority number Date
US9721898 26.11.1997
US75396296 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0943158Global Dossier 19.01.2005B1
EP0943158 22.09.1999A2
Priority number Date
US9722171 26.11.1997
US76093396 06.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0923725Global Dossier 23.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
US70935896 06.09.1996
US9713525 31.07.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0920624Global Dossier 17.04.2002A4
EP0920624 09.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
US9710997 24.06.1997
US67730596 09.07.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0871888Global Dossier 10.07.2002B1
EP0871888 21.10.1998A4
EP0871888 21.10.1998A1
Priority number Date
US9511333 06.09.1995
US30465794 09.09.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0852617Global Dossier 28.07.1999A4
EP0852617 15.07.1998A1
Priority number Date
US53445495 27.09.1995
US9614353 06.09.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0764322Global Dossier 19.08.1998A4
EP0764322 26.03.1997A1
Priority number Date
US25816894 10.06.1994
US9506999 07.06.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0727045Global Dossier 19.12.2001B1
EP0727045 22.04.1998A4
EP0727045 21.08.1996A1
Priority number Date
US9412270 26.10.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0717749Global Dossier 12.02.2003B1
EP0717749 01.07.1998A4
EP0717749 26.06.1996A1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US9508570 05.07.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0620822Global Dossier 30.05.2001B1
EP0620822 10.01.1996A4
EP0620822 26.10.1994A1
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
US9209827 06.11.1992
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1053055Global Dossier 30.07.2003B1
EP1053055 22.11.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9901651 26.01.1999
US1659698 30.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT201692T 15.06.2001T
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
US9209827 06.11.1992
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT211259T 15.01.2002T
Priority number Date
US9412270 26.10.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT220459T 15.07.2002T
Priority number Date
US9511333 06.09.1995
US30465794 09.09.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT232604T 15.02.2003T
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US9508570 05.07.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT246040T 15.08.2003T
Priority number Date
US9901651 26.01.1999
US1659698 30.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT272068T 15.08.2004T
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT287575T 15.02.2005T
Priority number Date
US9722171 26.11.1997
US76093396 06.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT328114T 15.06.2006T
Priority number Date
US3015698 25.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT517173T 15.08.2011T
Priority number Date
US43631199 08.11.1999
US0030480 03.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU667497B 28.03.1996B2
AU3136493 07.06.1993A
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
US9209827 06.11.1992
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU692800B 18.06.1998B2
AU8125794 23.05.1995A
Priority number Date
US9412270 26.10.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU702773B 04.03.1999B2
AU3507095 27.03.1996A
Priority number Date
US9511333 06.09.1995
US30465794 09.09.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU708677B 12.08.1999B2
AU2966195 09.02.1996A
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US9508570 05.07.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU722148B 20.07.2000B2
AU3717697 02.02.1998A
Priority number Date
US9710997 24.06.1997
US67730596 09.07.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU723134B 17.08.2000B2
AU6968996 17.04.1997A
Priority number Date
US53445495 27.09.1995
US9614353 06.09.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU723564B 31.08.2000B2
AU4071997 26.03.1998A
Priority number Date
US9714489 18.08.1997
US70826296 06.09.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU725433C 19.07.2001C
AU725433B 12.10.2000B2
AU3823297 26.03.1998A
Priority number Date
US70935896 06.09.1996
US9713525 31.07.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU733523B 17.05.2001B2
AU5367198 29.06.1998A
Priority number Date
US9721898 26.11.1997
US75396296 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU738493B 20.09.2001B2
AU1706999 28.06.1999A
Priority number Date
US9825475 01.12.1998
US98606597 05.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU742310B 20.12.2001B2
AU5371298 17.07.1998A
Priority number Date
US9722171 26.11.1997
US76093396 06.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU742960B 17.01.2002B2
AU2763899 06.09.1999A
Priority number Date
US23959899 29.01.1999
US24093199 29.01.1999
US24092099 29.01.1999
US24048999 29.01.1999
US9903080 11.02.1999
US2661898 20.02.1998
US23956999 29.01.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU743074B 17.01.2002B2
AU2344599 16.08.1999A
Priority number Date
US9901651 26.01.1999
US1659698 30.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU763514B 24.07.2003B2
AU2595000 12.07.2000A
Priority number Date
US9931098 22.12.1999
US11373098 23.12.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU769715B 05.02.2004B2
AU6403400 05.02.2001A
Priority number Date
US35493199 15.07.1999
US0040181 09.06.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU769929B 12.02.2004B2
AU3930500 14.11.2000A
Priority number Date
US29012999 12.04.1999
US0008432 28.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU1466201 06.06.2001A
Priority number Date
US43631199 08.11.1999
US0030480 03.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU1742300 19.06.2000A
Priority number Date
US20372598 02.12.1998
US20393598 02.12.1998
US20432498 02.12.1998
US20373098 02.12.1998
US9927668 22.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2765399 15.09.1999A
Priority number Date
US9903175 12.02.1999
US3015698 25.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU3277901 31.07.2001A
Priority number Date
US48985500 24.01.2000
US0100926 12.01.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU4157402 18.06.2002A
Priority number Date
US0146128 30.10.2001
US9710200 09.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU6788800 08.10.2001A
Priority number Date
US0008432 28.03.2000
US0022805 18.08.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU7258398 24.11.1998A
Priority number Date
US9808370 29.04.1998
US84687697 01.05.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU7474098 08.12.1998A
Priority number Date
US9809357 07.05.1998
US85505897 14.05.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9407952 26.11.1996A
Priority number Date
US9412270 26.10.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9506035 14.10.1997A
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US9508570 05.07.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9508908 28.10.1997A
Priority number Date
US9511333 06.09.1995
US30465794 09.09.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9610618 06.04.1999A
Priority number Date
US53445495 27.09.1995
US9614353 06.09.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9710271 10.08.1999A
Priority number Date
US9710997 24.06.1997
US67730596 09.07.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9712800 23.11.1999A
Priority number Date
US9714489 18.08.1997
US70826296 06.09.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9712803 23.11.1999A
Priority number Date
US70935896 06.09.1996
US9713525 31.07.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9713991 08.02.2000A
Priority number Date
US9721898 26.11.1997
US75396296 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9713995 29.02.2000A
Priority number Date
US9722171 26.11.1997
US76093396 06.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9814257 03.10.2000A
Priority number Date
US9825475 01.12.1998
US98606597 05.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9908349 05.12.2000A
Priority number Date
US9901651 26.01.1999
US1659698 30.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9909207 06.11.2001A
Priority number Date
US23959899 29.01.1999
US24093199 29.01.1999
US24092099 29.01.1999
US24048999 29.01.1999
US9903080 11.02.1999
US2661898 20.02.1998
US23956999 29.01.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9916840 09.10.2001A
Priority number Date
US9931098 22.12.1999
US11373098 23.12.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2123133 04.01.2005C
CA2123133 13.05.1993A1
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
US9209827 06.11.1992
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2169852 23.09.2008C
CA2169852 25.01.1996A1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US9508570 05.07.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2175483 30.11.2004C
CA2175483 11.05.1995A1
Priority number Date
US9412270 26.10.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2191240 21.12.1995A1
Priority number Date
US25816894 10.06.1994
US9506999 07.06.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2199515 20.05.2003C
CA2199515 14.03.1996A1
Priority number Date
US9511333 06.09.1995
US30465794 09.09.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2233238 03.04.1997A1
Priority number Date
US53445495 27.09.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2259406 17.06.2003C
CA2259406 15.01.1998A1
Priority number Date
US9710997 24.06.1997
US67730596 09.07.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2264688 12.03.1998A1
Priority number Date
US70935896 06.09.1996
US9713525 31.07.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2264780 01.08.2006C
CA2264780 12.03.1998A1
Priority number Date
US9714489 18.08.1997
US70826296 06.09.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2274047 11.06.1998A1
Priority number Date
US9721898 26.11.1997
US75396296 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2274071 16.01.2007C
CA2274071 02.07.1998A1
Priority number Date
US9722171 26.11.1997
US76093396 06.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2312568 17.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
US9825475 01.12.1998
US98606597 05.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2319705 15.07.2008C
CA2319705 05.08.1999A1
Priority number Date
US9901651 26.01.1999
US1659698 30.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2320798 15.01.2008C
CA2320798 26.08.1999A1
Priority number Date
US23959899 29.01.1999
US24093199 29.01.1999
US24092099 29.01.1999
US24048999 29.01.1999
US9903080 11.02.1999
US2661898 20.02.1998
US23956999 29.01.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2322206 02.09.1999A1
Priority number Date
US9903175 12.02.1999
US3015698 25.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2353461 29.06.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9931098 22.12.1999
US11373098 23.12.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2366657 19.10.2000A1
Priority number Date
US29112999 12.04.1999
US0008432 28.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2379762 25.01.2001A1
Priority number Date
US35493199 15.07.1999
US0040181 09.06.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2389314 12.07.2011C
CA2389314 17.05.2001A1
Priority number Date
US43631199 08.11.1999
US0030480 03.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2477138 26.07.2005C
CA2477138 11.05.1995A1
Priority number Date
CA2175483 26.10.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2504343 11.05.1995A1
Priority number Date
US14650493 01.11.1993
CA2477138 26.10.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2564293 02.07.1998A1
Priority number Date
CA2274071 26.11.1997
US76093396 06.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1121614C 17.09.2003C
CN1164894 12.11.1997A
Priority number Date
US30465794 09.09.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1151374C 26.05.2004C
CN1135220 06.11.1996A
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1142821C 24.03.2004C
CN1141078 22.01.1997A
Priority number Date
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1148579C 05.05.2004C
CN1255197 31.05.2000A
Priority number Date
US67730596 09.07.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1180248C 15.12.2004C
CN1230255 29.09.1999A
Priority number Date
US70826296 06.09.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1202929 23.12.1998A
Priority number Date
US53445495 27.09.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1234116 03.11.1999A
Priority number Date
US70935896 06.09.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1237165C 18.01.2006C
CN1296525 23.05.2001A
Priority number Date
US23959899 29.01.1999
US24093199 29.01.1999
US24092099 29.01.1999
US24048999 29.01.1999
US2661898 20.02.1998
US23956999 29.01.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1252282C 19.04.2006C
CN1297489 30.05.2001A
Priority number Date
US3015698 25.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1268634C 09.08.2006C
CN1284082 14.02.2001A
Priority number Date
US98606597 05.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1268905 04.10.2000A
Priority number Date
US75396296 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1278418C 04.10.2006C
CN1287689 14.03.2001A
Priority number Date
US76093396 06.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1550556 01.12.2004A
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1558207 29.12.2004A
Priority number Date
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1920055 28.02.2007A
Priority number Date
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69231853D 05.07.2001D1
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
US9209827 06.11.1992
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69231853T 13.09.2001T2
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
US9209827 06.11.1992
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69233391D 02.09.2004D1
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69429535D 31.01.2002D1
Priority number Date
US9412270 26.10.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69429535T 22.08.2002T2
Priority number Date
US9412270 26.10.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69527375D 14.08.2002D1
Priority number Date
US9511333 06.09.1995
US30465794 09.09.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69527375T 13.02.2003T2
Priority number Date
US9511333 06.09.1995
US30465794 09.09.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69529601D 20.03.2003D1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US9508570 05.07.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69732305D 24.02.2005D1
Priority number Date
US9722171 26.11.1997
US76093396 06.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69732305T 06.04.2006T2
Priority number Date
US9722171 26.11.1997
US76093396 06.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69909971D 04.09.2003D1
Priority number Date
US9901651 26.01.1999
US1659698 30.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69931608T 16.05.2007T2
DE69931608D 06.07.2006D1
Priority number Date
US9903175 12.02.1999
US3015698 25.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK0620822T 27.08.2001T3
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
US9209827 06.11.1992
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK0727045T 15.04.2002T3
Priority number Date
US9412270 26.10.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK0871888T 14.10.2002T3
Priority number Date
US9511333 06.09.1995
US30465794 09.09.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK1230340T 31.10.2011T3
Priority number Date
US43631199 08.11.1999
US0030480 03.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2159282T 01.10.2001T3
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2170133T 01.08.2002T3
Priority number Date
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2179114T 16.01.2003T3
Priority number Date
US30465794 09.09.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2235262T 01.07.2005T3
Priority number Date
US76093396 06.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2370081T 12.12.2011T3
Priority number Date
US43631199 08.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
FI961034 02.05.1996A
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US9508570 05.07.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
FI961843 20.06.1996A
Priority number Date
US9412270 26.10.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
FI970957 07.05.1997A
Priority number Date
US9511333 06.09.1995
US30465794 09.09.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GR3036456T 30.11.2001T3
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
US9209827 06.11.1992
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1011079 07.06.2002A1
Priority number Date
US9412270 26.10.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1011080 27.06.2003A1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US9508570 05.07.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1034519 22.12.2006A1
Priority number Date
US9825475 01.12.1998
US98606597 05.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL145880 19.08.2007A
IL145880D 25.07.2002D0
Priority number Date
US29112999 12.04.1999
US0008432 28.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR100507815B 10.08.2005B1
KR20000057427 15.09.2000A
Priority number Date
US76093396 06.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR100545275B 24.01.2006B1
KR20000023659 25.04.2000A
Priority number Date
US67730596 09.07.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR100591626B 20.06.2006B1
KR20010029477 06.04.2001A
Priority number Date
US70826296 06.09.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20000057400 15.09.2000A
Priority number Date
US75396296 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20000068494 25.11.2000A
Priority number Date
US70935896 06.09.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MXPA01010381 21.07.2003A
Priority number Date
US29012999 12.04.1999
US0008432 28.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NO20014932L 12.12.2001L
NO20014932D 10.10.2001D0
Priority number Date
US29012999 12.04.1999
US0008432 28.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ275962 28.07.1998A
Priority number Date
US9412270 26.10.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ289731 24.09.1998A
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US9508570 05.07.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ292791 26.06.1998A
Priority number Date
US9511333 06.09.1995
NZ29279195 06.09.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ318253 28.02.2000A
Priority number Date
US53445495 27.09.1995
US9614353 06.09.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ330036 28.01.2000A
Priority number Date
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ330037 28.01.2000A
Priority number Date
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ333947 24.11.2000A
Priority number Date
US9710997 24.06.1997
US67730596 09.07.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ334314 29.09.2000A
Priority number Date
US9714489 18.08.1997
US70826296 06.09.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ334450 27.10.2000A
Priority number Date
US70935896 06.09.1996
US9713525 31.07.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ500373 31.08.2001A
Priority number Date
US14650493 01.11.1993
NZ33003694 26.10.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ505615 30.11.2001A
Priority number Date
US70935896 06.09.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ505858 27.09.2002A
Priority number Date
US9901651 26.01.1999
US1659698 30.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ506204 30.06.2003A
Priority number Date
US23959899 29.01.1999
US24093199 29.01.1999
US24092099 29.01.1999
US24048999 29.01.1999
US9903080 11.02.1999
US2661898 20.02.1998
US23956999 29.01.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ512087 30.05.2003A
Priority number Date
US9931098 22.12.1999
US11373098 23.12.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ512954 28.03.2003A
Priority number Date
NZ50561597 31.07.1997
US70935896 06.09.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PT727045E 28.06.2002E
Priority number Date
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PT1230340E 13.10.2011E
Priority number Date
US43631199 08.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5532129 02.07.1996A
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
US25095194 27.05.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5565322 15.10.1996A
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
US9209827 06.11.1992
US23223394 05.05.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5605662 25.02.1997A
Priority number Date
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5632957 27.05.1997A
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US30465794 09.09.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5787032 28.07.1998A
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
US23223394 05.05.1994
US25095194 27.05.1994
US25816894 10.06.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5835404 10.11.1998A
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
US90656997 05.08.1997
US23223394 05.05.1994
US25816894 10.06.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5849486 15.12.1998A
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US30465794 09.09.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5849489 15.12.1998A
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
US23223394 05.05.1994
US25095194 27.05.1994
US70360196 23.08.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5929208 27.07.1999A
Priority number Date
US72597696 04.10.1996
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5965452 12.10.1999A
Priority number Date
US67730596 09.07.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6017696 25.01.2000A
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6048690 11.04.2000A
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
US27188294 07.07.1994
US23223394 05.05.1994
US25095194 27.05.1994
US30465794 09.09.1994
US70360196 23.08.1996
US25816894 10.06.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US85505897 14.05.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6051380 18.04.2000A
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US30465794 09.09.1994
US70826296 06.09.1996
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US98606597 05.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6067246 23.05.2000A
Priority number Date
US12974098 05.08.1998
US79026291 07.11.1991
US90656997 05.08.1997
US23223394 05.05.1994
US25095194 27.05.1994
US25816894 10.06.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6068818 30.05.2000A
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US30465794 09.09.1994
US85964497 20.05.1997
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US2661898 20.02.1998
US75396296 04.12.1996
US23956999 29.01.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6071394 06.06.2000A
Priority number Date
US70935896 06.09.1996
US1659698 30.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6099803 08.08.2000A
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US72597696 04.10.1996
US30465794 09.09.1994
US85964497 20.05.1997
US14650496 01.11.1996
US70935896 06.09.1996
US53445495 27.09.1995
US2661898 20.02.1998
US75396296 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6129828 10.10.2000A
Priority number Date
US70935896 06.09.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6162603 19.12.2000A
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
US23223394 05.05.1994
US25095194 27.05.1994
US70360196 23.08.1996
US12363898 28.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6207373 27.03.2001B1
Priority number Date
US3015698 25.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6225059 01.05.2001B1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US72597696 04.10.1996
US30465794 09.09.1994
US24048999 29.01.1999
US67730596 09.07.1996
US85964497 20.05.1997
US70935896 06.09.1996
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US2661898 20.02.1998
US75396296 04.12.1996
US84687697 01.05.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6238624 29.05.2001B1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US72627896 04.10.1996
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6245508 12.06.2001B1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US30465794 09.09.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
US14128698 27.08.1998
US53445495 27.09.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6254827 03.07.2001B1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US72597696 04.10.1996
US24092099 29.01.1999
US30465794 09.09.1994
US67730596 09.07.1996
US85964497 20.05.1997
US70935896 06.09.1996
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US2661898 20.02.1998
US75396296 04.12.1996
US84687697 01.05.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6258606 10.07.2001B1
Priority number Date
US36467699 30.07.1999
US67730596 09.07.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6280590 28.08.2001B1
Priority number Date
US54852200 13.04.2000
US70935896 06.09.1996
US1659698 30.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6287517 11.09.2001B1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US30465794 09.09.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
US70935896 06.09.1996
US53445495 27.09.1995
US75396296 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6306348 23.10.2001B1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US30465794 09.09.1994
US35493199 15.07.1999
US70826296 06.09.1996
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US98606597 05.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6309601 30.10.2001B1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US30465794 09.09.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
US84687697 01.05.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6309602 30.10.2001B1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US20372598 02.12.1998
US30465794 09.09.1994
US70935896 06.09.1996
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US75396296 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6315953 13.11.2001B1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US72597696 04.10.1996
US24093199 29.01.1999
US30465794 09.09.1994
US85964497 20.05.1997
US70935896 06.09.1996
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US2661898 20.02.1998
US75396296 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6319472 20.11.2001B1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US20393598 02.12.1998
US30465794 09.09.1994
US70935896 06.09.1996
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US75396296 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6331274 18.12.2001B1
Priority number Date
US23959899 29.01.1999
US27188294 07.07.1994
US30465794 09.09.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US2661898 20.02.1998
US75396296 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6375899 23.04.2002B1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US30465794 09.09.1994
US70935896 06.09.1996
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US20373098 02.12.1998
US75396296 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6379897 30.04.2002B1
Priority number Date
US71020000 09.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6385080 07.05.2002B1
Priority number Date
US12974098 05.08.1998
US79026291 07.11.1991
US90656997 05.08.1997
US23223394 05.05.1994
US25816894 10.06.1994
US56852700 09.05.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6395493 28.05.2002B1
Priority number Date
US64575700 24.08.2000
US3015698 25.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6403367 11.06.2002B1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US47044899 22.12.1999
US30465794 09.09.1994
US70935896 06.09.1996
US53445495 27.09.1995
US98606597 05.12.1997
US1659698 30.01.1998
US11373098 23.12.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6416953 09.07.2002B1
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
US9209827 06.11.1992
US23223394 05.05.1994
US25095194 27.05.1994
US72475300 28.11.2000
US70360196 23.08.1996
US12363898 28.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6423271 23.07.2002B1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US30465794 09.09.1994
US52706900 16.03.2000
US70935896 06.09.1996
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US75396296 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6468742 22.10.2002B2
US2001014449 16.08.2001A1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US29112999 12.04.1999
US30465794 09.09.1994
US70826296 06.09.1996
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US3015698 25.02.1998
US98606597 05.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6492122 10.12.2002B2
US2002150917 17.10.2002A1
Priority number Date
US71020000 09.11.2000
US97540801 10.10.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6518022 11.02.2003B1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US30465794 09.09.1994
US70826296 06.09.1996
US44453999 22.11.1999
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US98606597 05.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6540961 01.04.2003B1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US53236400 21.03.2000
US30465794 09.09.1994
US70935896 06.09.1996
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US2661898 20.02.1998
US75396296 04.12.1996
US23956999 29.01.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6569382 27.05.2003B1
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
US27188294 07.07.1994
US23223394 05.05.1994
US43631199 08.11.1999
US70360196 23.08.1996
US25816894 10.06.1994
US53445495 27.09.1995
US98606597 05.12.1997
US76093396 06.12.1996
US12974098 05.08.1998
US90656997 05.08.1997
US30465794 09.09.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
US85505897 14.05.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6582660 24.06.2003B1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US30465794 09.09.1994
US85964497 20.05.1997
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6638482 28.10.2003B1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US30465794 09.09.1994
US20432498 02.12.1998
US70935896 06.09.1996
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US75396296 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6652808 25.11.2003B1
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
US27188294 07.07.1994
US23223394 05.05.1994
US25095194 27.05.1994
US30465794 09.09.1994
US70360196 23.08.1996
US25816894 10.06.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US76093396 06.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6682936 27.01.2004B2
US2002029971 14.03.2002A1
Priority number Date
US36467699 30.07.1999
US90311001 10.07.2001
US67730596 09.07.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6706473 16.03.2004B1
Priority number Date
US48985500 24.01.2000
US43631199 08.11.1999
US76093396 06.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6726880 27.04.2004B1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US59665700 19.06.2000
US30465794 09.09.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US2661898 20.02.1998
US75396296 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6753148 22.06.2004B2
US2002115098 22.08.2002A1
Priority number Date
US10828002 25.03.2002
US64575700 24.08.2000
US3015698 25.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6821729 23.11.2004B2
US2002028503 07.03.2002A1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US72597696 04.10.1996
US24093199 29.01.1999
US30465794 09.09.1994
US85964497 20.05.1997
US95245901 12.09.2001
US70935896 06.09.1996
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US2661898 20.02.1998
US75396296 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6824740 30.11.2004B1
Priority number Date
US56131800 28.04.2000
US70935896 06.09.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6867048 15.03.2005B2
US2002127733 12.09.2002A1
Priority number Date
US36467699 30.07.1999
US90311001 10.07.2001
US67730596 09.07.1996
US14303702 07.05.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6911310 28.06.2005B2
US2003054361 20.03.2003A1
Priority number Date
US79026291 07.11.1991
US9209827 06.11.1992
US23223394 05.05.1994
US25095194 27.05.1994
US72475300 28.11.2000
US70360196 23.08.1996
US99737401 29.11.2001
US12363898 28.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6989086 24.01.2006B2
US2001045359 29.11.2001A1
Priority number Date
US54852200 13.04.2000
US90575501 13.07.2001
US70935896 06.09.1996
US1659698 30.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7045097 16.05.2006B2
US2002131899 19.09.2002A1
Priority number Date
US36467699 30.07.1999
US90311001 10.07.2001
US67730596 09.07.1996
US14303602 07.05.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7101661 05.09.2006B1
Priority number Date
US59786600 20.06.2000
US27188294 07.07.1994
US30465794 09.09.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
US14128698 27.08.1998
US53445495 27.09.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7172864 06.02.2007B1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US49096500 24.01.2000
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7172896 06.02.2007B2
US2002155586 24.10.2002A1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US47044899 22.12.1999
US30465794 09.09.1994
US70935896 06.09.1996
US53445495 27.09.1995
US98606597 05.12.1997
US16383502 05.06.2002
US1659698 30.01.1998
US11373098 23.12.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7241419 10.07.2007B2
US2001026935 04.10.2001A1
Priority number Date
US23959899 29.01.1999
US27188294 07.07.1994
US72597696 04.10.1996
US30465794 09.09.1994
US85964497 20.05.1997
US70935896 06.09.1996
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US2661898 20.02.1998
US75396296 04.12.1996
US84912201 04.05.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7314708 01.01.2008B1
Priority number Date
US12871898 04.08.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7425308 16.09.2008B2
US2001026778 04.10.2001A1
Priority number Date
US23959899 29.01.1999
US84911901 04.05.2001
US27188294 07.07.1994
US72597696 04.10.1996
US30465794 09.09.1994
US85964497 20.05.1997
US70935896 06.09.1996
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US2661898 20.02.1998
US75396296 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7582421 01.09.2009B2
US2003073122 17.04.2003A1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US29112999 12.04.1999
US30465794 09.09.1994
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US3015698 25.02.1998
US98606597 05.12.1997
US24520602 16.09.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8389212 05.03.2013B1
Priority number Date
US72597696 04.10.1996
US35878899 22.07.1999
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2001052976 20.12.2001A1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US30465794 09.09.1994
US92782001 09.08.2001
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US84687697 01.05.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2002085954 04.07.2002A1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US2947201 22.10.2001
US30465794 09.09.1994
US35493199 15.07.1999
US70826296 06.09.1996
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US98606597 05.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2002119484 29.08.2002A1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US71020000 09.11.2000
US49096500 24.01.2000
US7557902 12.02.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2003059929 27.03.2003A1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US49096500 24.01.2000
US91201401 24.07.2001
US14650493 01.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2003190632 09.10.2003A1
Priority number Date
US27188294 07.07.1994
US72597696 04.10.1996
US30465794 09.09.1994
US85964497 20.05.1997
US70826296 06.09.1996
US44453999 22.11.1999
US14650493 01.11.1993
US53445495 27.09.1995
US98606597 05.12.1997
US17017202 11.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9938612Global Dossier 05.08.1999A1
Priority number Date
US1659698 30.01.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1170942C 13.10.2004C
CN1291913 18.04.2001A
Priority number Date
US1659698 30.01.1998