Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1053055

EP1053055 - CHANNEL-LESS SEPARATION OF BIOPARTICLES ON A BIOELECTRONIC CHIP BY DIELECTROPHORESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.06.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NANOGEN, INC.
10398 Pacific Center Court
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2000/47]
Inventor(s)01 / CHENG, Jing c/o AVIVA Biosciences
11568-9 Sorrento Valley Road
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
02 / SHELDON, Edward, L., III
12515 Birch Bluff Place
San Diego, CA 92131 / US
03 / WU, Lei
14021 Capewood Lane
San Diego, CA 92128 / US
04 / O'CONNELL, James, P.
682 Hoska Drive
Del Mar, CA 92014 / US
 [2001/18]
Former [2000/47]01 / CHENG, Jing
10706 Caminito Alvarez
San Diego, CA 92126 / US
02 / SHELDON, Edward, L., III
12515 Birch Bluff Place
San Diego, CA 92131 / US
03 / WU, Lei
14021 Capewood Lane
San Diego, CA 92128 / US
04 / O'CONNELL, James, P.
682 Hoska Drive
Del Mar, CA 92014 / US
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Application number, filing date99903423.426.01.1999
[2000/47]
WO1999US01651
Priority number, dateUS1998001659630.01.1998         Original published format: US 16596
[2000/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9938612
Date:05.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1053055
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999
[2000/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1053055
Date:30.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:B01J19/00, B01L3/00, B03C5/02, G01N33/53, C12Q1/68, C12N13/00
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/47]
TitleGerman:KANALLOSE TRENNUNG VON BIOPARTIKELN AUF EINEM BIOELEKTRONISCHEN CHIP DURCH DIELEKTROPHORESIS[2000/47]
English:CHANNEL-LESS SEPARATION OF BIOPARTICLES ON A BIOELECTRONIC CHIP BY DIELECTROPHORESIS[2000/47]
French:SEPARATION DE BIOPARTICULES, SANS FORMATION DE CONDUIT, SUR UNE PUCE BIOELECTRONIQUE AU MOYEN D'UNE DIELECTROPHORESE[2000/47]
Entry into regional phase29.08.2000National basic fee paid 
29.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
29.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
27.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.05.2003Fee for grant paid
28.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.07.2003
BE30.07.2003
CH30.07.2003
CY30.07.2003
FI30.07.2003
FR30.07.2003
IT30.07.2003
LI30.07.2003
NL30.07.2003
DK30.10.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
DE31.10.2003
ES10.11.2003
PT30.12.2003
IE26.01.2004
LU26.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/21]AT30.07.2003
BE30.07.2003
CH30.07.2003
CY30.07.2003
FI30.07.2003
FR30.07.2003
LI30.07.2003
NL30.07.2003
DK30.10.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
DE31.10.2003
ES10.11.2003
PT30.12.2003
IE26.01.2004
LU26.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
Former [2006/14]AT30.07.2003
BE30.07.2003
CH30.07.2003
FI30.07.2003
FR30.07.2003
LI30.07.2003
NL30.07.2003
DK30.10.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
DE31.10.2003
ES10.11.2003
PT30.12.2003
IE26.01.2004
LU26.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
Former [2005/23]AT30.07.2003
BE30.07.2003
CH30.07.2003
FI30.07.2003
LI30.07.2003
NL30.07.2003
DK30.10.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
DE31.10.2003
ES10.11.2003
PT30.12.2003
IE26.01.2004
LU26.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
Former [2005/03]AT30.07.2003
BE30.07.2003
CH30.07.2003
FI30.07.2003
LI30.07.2003
NL30.07.2003
DK30.10.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
DE31.10.2003
ES10.11.2003
PT30.12.2003
IE26.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
Former [2005/02]AT30.07.2003
BE30.07.2003
CH30.07.2003
FI30.07.2003
LI30.07.2003
NL30.07.2003
DK30.10.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
DE31.10.2003
ES10.11.2003
PT30.12.2003
MC31.01.2004
Former [2004/46]AT30.07.2003
BE30.07.2003
CH30.07.2003
FI30.07.2003
LI30.07.2003
NL30.07.2003
DK30.10.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
DE31.10.2003
ES10.11.2003
PT30.12.2003
Former [2004/31]AT30.07.2003
BE30.07.2003
CH30.07.2003
FI30.07.2003
LI30.07.2003
NL30.07.2003
DK30.10.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
DE31.10.2003
PT30.12.2003
Former [2004/29]AT30.07.2003
BE30.07.2003
CH30.07.2003
FI30.07.2003
LI30.07.2003
NL30.07.2003
DK30.10.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
Former [2004/28]AT30.07.2003
BE30.07.2003
CH30.07.2003
FI30.07.2003
LI30.07.2003
NL30.07.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
Former [2004/22]AT30.07.2003
CH30.07.2003
FI30.07.2003
LI30.07.2003
NL30.07.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
Former [2004/16]AT30.07.2003
FI30.07.2003
NL30.07.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
Former [2004/14]AT30.07.2003
FI30.07.2003
NL30.07.2003
GR30.10.2003
Former [2004/13]FI30.07.2003
NL30.07.2003
Former [2004/12]FI30.07.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]DE4400955  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7-9 * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 11; figures 3,4; claims 1,5,11,13,14,17 *;
 [A]WO9305166  (FUCELL PTY LTD [AU]) [A] 1,5,10,12,13,20,21,24,25 * page 5, line 10 - page 8, line 32; claims 1,2,5,6,9,10,12-15,17 * * page 19, line 33 - page 20, line 4 *;
 [A]US4441972  (POHL HERBERT A [US]) [A] 1,20,21 * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]WO9607917  (NANOGEN [US]) [A] 1-3,5,7-9,12,20-25 * page 8, line 31 - page 10, line 3 * * page 13, line 32 - page 17, line 15 * * page 18, line 14 - page 19, line 22; figures 2,6; claims 1,6,14,17 *
 [XA]  - FUHR G ET AL, "POSITIONING AND MANIPULATION OF CELLS AND MICROPARTICLES USING MINIATURIZED ELECTRIC FIELD TRAPS AND TRAVELLING WAVES", SENSORS AND MATERIALS, (1995), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 131 - 146, XP000617993 [X] 1-4,7-9 * page 132, paragraph 4 - page 133, paragraph 2 * * page 134, paragraph 1 * * page 135, paragraph 2 * * page 145; figure 7D * [A] 20,21