Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1051424

EP1051424 - NOVEL SYNTHONS FOR OLIGONUCLEOTIDE SYNTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.03.2006
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.05.2006  [2006/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HYBRIDON, INC.
345 Vassar Street Cambridge
Massachusetts 02139 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/06]For all designated states
HYBRIDON, INC.
345 Vassar Street
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
HYBRIDON, INC.
155 Fortune Boulevard
Milford, MA 01757 / US
Inventor(s)01 / IYER, Radhakrishnan, P.
34 I Shrewsbury Green Drive
Shrewsbury, MA 01545 / US
02 / YU, Dong
25 Indian Pond Road
Westboro, MA 01581 / US
03 / GUO, Mao-Jun
Apartment 2, 193 Pearl Street
Somerville, MA 02145 / US
04 / AGRAWAL, Sudhir
61 Lamplighter Drive
Shrewsbury, MA 01545 / US
[2000/46]
Representative(s)Vossius, Corinna , et al
Corinna Vossius IP Group
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Widenmayerstrasse 43
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/06]Vossius, Corinna , et al
Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Holbeinstrasse 5
81679 München / DE
Former [2000/46]Vossius, Corinna
Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Holbeinstrasse 5
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date99903489.528.01.1999
[2000/46]
WO1999US01949
Priority number, dateUS1998001547229.01.1998         Original published format: US 15472
[2000/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9938878
Date:05.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1051424
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999
[2000/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07H19/11, C07H19/213, C07H21/00
[2000/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/46]
TitleGerman:NEUE SYNTHONE FÜR DIE SYNTHESE VON OLIGONUKLEOTIDEN[2000/46]
English:NOVEL SYNTHONS FOR OLIGONUCLEOTIDE SYNTHESIS[2000/46]
French:SYNTHONS D'UN TYPE NOUVEAU PERMETTANT LA SYNTHESE D'OLIGONUCLEOTIDES[2000/46]
Entry into regional phase17.08.2000National basic fee paid 
17.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
13.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.10.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/19]
29.11.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
16.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200608   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[DXY]WO9639413  (HYBRIDON INC [US], et al) [DX] 1,4,5,9,12-14 * claim - * [Y] 1,4,12;
 [DX]  - IYER, RADHAKRISHNAN P. ET AL, "A novel nucleoside phosphoramidite synthon derived from 1R,2S-ephedrine", TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY (1995), 6(5), 1051-4, XP004048198 [DX] 1,4,5,12-14 * page 1051 * * see page 1052, scheme 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0957-4166(95)00122-6
 [X]  - MARSAULT, ERIC ET AL, "Oxazaphosphorinane precursors to the diastereoselective synthesis of DNA phosphorothioates", TETRAHEDRON (1997), 53(50), 16945-16958, XP004106499 [X] 1,9-11 * see page 16946, scheme 1 * * see page 16950, scheme 6, in particular compound 22 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(97)10173-9
 [DX]  - IYER, RADHAKRISHNAN P. ET AL, "Nucleoside Oxazaphospholidines as Novel Synthons in Oligonucleotide Synthesis", J. ORG. CHEM. (1995), 60(17), 5388-9, XP002016244 [DX] 1,9 * page 5388, column L * * see page 5388, scheme 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00122a012
 [X]  - XIN, ZHILI ET AL, "Diastereoselective synthesis of phosphite triesters", TETRAHEDRON LETT. (1996), 37(7), 969-72, XP004030203 [X] 1 * see page 970, scheme 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4039(95)02354-2
 [Y]  - KRASZEWSKI, ADAM ET AL, "Reactions of nucleoside H-phosphonates with bifunctional reagents. Part 1 Reaction with amino alcohols", J. CHEM. SOC., PERKIN TRANS. 1 (1993), (14), 1699-704, XP002105664 [Y] 1,4,12 * see page 1700, scheme 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/p19930001699
 [Y]  - FARQUHAR, DAVID ET AL, "Synthesis and biological evaluation of neutral derivatives of 5-fluoro-2'-deoxyuridine 5'-phosphate", J. MED. CHEM. (1983), 26(8), 1153-8, XP002105663 [Y] 4 * see page 1154, scheme II *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00362a013
 [PX]  - MARSAULT, ERIC ET AL, "Imidazo-oxazaphosphorines as precursors to chiral phosphite triesters", NUCLEOSIDES NUCLEOTIDES (1998), 17(5), 939-955, XP002105662 [PX] 1,4,5,15-17 * page 939 * * see schemes 3 and 5, compound 15 * * see page 946, last paragraph - page 947, first paragraph * * see scheme 7 *
 [PX]  - GUO, MAOJUN ET AL, "Solid-phase stereoselective synthesis of 2'-O-methyl-oligo-ribonucleoside phosphorothioates using nucleoside bicyclic oxazaphospholidines", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT. (1998), 8(18), 2539-2544, XP004138266 [PX] 1-3 * see page 2540, compounds 2a-2b * * see page 2541, scheme 1 * * see page 2542, scheme 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(98)00450-8
 [PX]  - IYER, RADHAKRISHNAN P. ET AL, "Solid-phase stereoselective synthesis of oligonucleoside phosphorothioates: the nucleoside bicyclic oxazaphospholidines as novel synthons", TETRAHEDRON LETT. (1998), 39(17), 2491-2494, XP004112077 [PX] 9-11 * see page 2492, compounds 2b and 3 as well as the first two paragraphs * * see page 2493, scheme 2 and last two lines *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(98)00380-3