Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975455

EP0975455 - KNIFE FOR CUTTING TUBEROUS PLANTS, MAINLY POTATOES, INTO RODS OR OTHER SHAPES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.09.2003
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.11.2003  [2003/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stumabo International N.V.
Industrieweg 3
2630 Aartselaar / BE
[2002/46]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Stumabo International N.V.
Boomsessteenweg 10
2627 Schelle / BE
Inventor(s)01 / VAN HEMELRIJK, Theophiel, Mark
Buerstedelei 34
B-2630 Aartselaar / BE
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Pieraerts, Jacques , et al
Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5
1831 Diegem / BE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Pieraerts, Jacques , et al
Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Patent Attorneys, Rue de Livourne 7
1060 Brussels / BE
Application number, filing date99903549.616.02.1999
[2000/05]
WO1999BE00021
Priority number, dateBE1998000011216.02.1998         Original published format: BE 9800112
BE1998000036514.05.1998         Original published format: BE 9800365
[2000/05]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9941043
Date:19.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975455
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975455
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:B26D1/00, B26D3/18
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/05]
TitleGerman:SCHNEIDEMESSER ZUM SCHNEIDEN IN STÄBCHEN, ODER ZUM FORMSCHNEIDEN VON KNOLLENGEMÜSEN, INSBESONDERE VON KARTOFFELN[2000/05]
English:KNIFE FOR CUTTING TUBEROUS PLANTS, MAINLY POTATOES, INTO RODS OR OTHER SHAPES[2000/05]
French:COUTEAU POUR COUPER DES PLANTES TUBERCULEUSES, PARTICULIEREMENT DES POMMES DE TERRE, EN FORMES DE TIGES OU ANALOGUES[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase16.02.1999Translation filed 
04.11.1999National basic fee paid 
04.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
09.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.09.2002Fee for grant paid
09.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US1824798  (ALTFATHER LEWIS F) [A] 1,6 * figure 14 *;
 [A]GB643708  (PENNY JOHNSON LTD, et al) [A] 1 * figure 6 *;
 [A]EP0295004  (URSCHEL LAB INC [US])