Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1049465

EP1049465 - USE OF INHIBITORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISORDERS RELATED TO RTK HYPERFUNCTION, ESPECIALLY CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  19.02.2016
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 18.05.2016  [2016/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V.
Hofgartenstrasse 8
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/20]For all designated states
Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V.
Hofgartenstrasse 8
80539 München / DE
Former [2006/41]For all designated states
Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V.
Hofgartenstrasse 8
80539 München / DE
Former [2000/45]For all designated states
Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V.
Hofgartenstrasse 2
80539 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ULLRICH, Axel
Türkenstrasse 104
D-80799 München / DE
02 / BANGE, Johannes
Schmuzerstrasse 5
D-81373 München / DE
03 / KNYAZEV, Pjotr
Hubertusstrasse 66
D-82131 Gauting / DE
[2000/45]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/45]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99903669.222.01.1999
[2000/45]
WO1999EP00405
Priority number, dateDE199810237722.01.1998         Original published format: DE 19802377
[2000/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9937299
Date:29.07.1999
Language:DE
[1999/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1049465
Date:08.11.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999
[2000/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1049465
Date:11.10.2006
Language:DE
[2006/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/40, C07K14/71, C07K16/28, C12N15/12, C12Q1/68, A61P35/00
[2006/12]
Former International [2000/45]A61K31/40, C07K14/71, C07K16/28, C12N15/12, C12Q1/68
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/45]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON INHIBITOREN FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG VON RTK-ÜBERFUNKTIONS-BEDINGTEN STÖRUNGEN, INSBESONDERE VON KREBS[2000/45]
English:USE OF INHIBITORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISORDERS RELATED TO RTK HYPERFUNCTION, ESPECIALLY CANCER[2000/45]
French:UTILISATION D'INHIBITEURS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES LIES A UNE HYPERFONCTION DE RECEPTEURS PRESENTANT UNE ACTIVITE DE TYROSINE KINASE (RTK), NOTAMMENT LE CANCER[2000/45]
Entry into regional phase09.08.2000National basic fee paid 
09.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
09.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/45]
29.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.2006Fee for grant paid
23.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.07.2007  19.07.2007  ADMISSIBLE
SANOFI
174, Avenue de France
75013 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Müller, Christian Stefan Gerd, et al
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Hansastraße 32
80686 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2011/30]
Opponent(s)01  11.07.2007  19.07.2007  ADMISSIBLE
SANOFI
174, Avenue de France
75013 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Müller, Christian Stefan Gerd, et al
Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6
81679 München / DE
Former [2007/33]
Opponent(s)01  11.07.2007   
Sanofi-Aventis
174, avenue de France
75013 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Müller, Christian Stefan Gerd, et al
Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstraße 6
D-81679 München / DE
16.08.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.04.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.12.2009Date of oral proceedings
05.02.2010Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
05.02.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.12.2015Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ]
10.12.2015Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/12]
05.02.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition15.04.2010Appeal received No.  T0694/10
15.06.2010Statement of grounds filed
10.12.2015Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
31.03.2010Appeal received No.  T0694/10
14.06.2010Statement of grounds filed
10.12.2015Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
10.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
16.12.2015Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
07.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
19.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY11.10.2006
FI11.10.2006
NL11.10.2006
GR12.01.2007
LU22.01.2007
MC31.01.2007
PT19.03.2007
AT22.01.2015
GB22.01.2015
IE22.01.2015
IT22.01.2015
ES23.01.2015
SE23.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
DK31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
FR02.02.2015
DE01.08.2015
[2016/20]
Former [2016/07]CY11.10.2006
FI11.10.2006
NL11.10.2006
GR12.01.2007
LU22.01.2007
MC31.01.2007
PT19.03.2007
AT22.01.2015
GB22.01.2015
IE22.01.2015
IT22.01.2015
SE23.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
DK31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
FR02.02.2015
DE01.08.2015
Former [2016/03]CY11.10.2006
FI11.10.2006
NL11.10.2006
GR12.01.2007
LU22.01.2007
MC31.01.2007
PT19.03.2007
AT22.01.2015
GB22.01.2015
IT22.01.2015
SE23.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
FR02.02.2015
DE01.08.2015
Former [2015/51]CY11.10.2006
FI11.10.2006
NL11.10.2006
GR12.01.2007
LU22.01.2007
MC31.01.2007
PT19.03.2007
AT22.01.2015
GB22.01.2015
SE23.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
FR02.02.2015
DE01.08.2015
Former [2015/48]CY11.10.2006
FI11.10.2006
NL11.10.2006
GR12.01.2007
LU22.01.2007
MC31.01.2007
PT19.03.2007
GB22.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
DE01.08.2015
Former [2015/47]CY11.10.2006
FI11.10.2006
NL11.10.2006
GR12.01.2007
LU22.01.2007
MC31.01.2007
PT19.03.2007
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
DE01.08.2015
Former [2015/30]CY11.10.2006
FI11.10.2006
NL11.10.2006
GR12.01.2007
LU22.01.2007
MC31.01.2007
PT19.03.2007
BE31.01.2015
Former [2010/06]CY11.10.2006
FI11.10.2006
NL11.10.2006
GR12.01.2007
LU22.01.2007
MC31.01.2007
PT19.03.2007
Former [2008/21]FI11.10.2006
NL11.10.2006
GR12.01.2007
MC31.01.2007
PT19.03.2007
Former [2008/17]FI11.10.2006
NL11.10.2006
MC31.01.2007
PT19.03.2007
Former [2007/30]FI11.10.2006
NL11.10.2006
PT19.03.2007
Former [2007/21]NL11.10.2006
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9713771  (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,29 * page 44 - page 52 *;
 [PX]WO9824432  (SUGEN INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-3,29,30 * page 102 - page 105 *;
 [PX]WO9850356  (SUGEN INC [US]) [PX] 1-3,29,30 * page 237 - page 264 *
 [DA]  - MOHAMMADI M ET AL, "STRUCTURES OF THE TYROSINE KINASE DOMAIN OF FIBROBLAST GROWTH FACTOR RECEPTOR IN COMPLEX WITH INHIBITORS", SCIENCE, (19970509), vol. 276, no. 5314, pages 955 - 960, XP002065235 [DA] 1-32

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.276.5314.955
Examination   - PANEK R.L.: 'In Vitro Pharmacological Characterization of PD 166285' JPET Bd. 283, Nr. 3, Seiten 1433 - 1444
    - BATLEY B.L.: 'Inhibition of FGF-1 Receptor Tyrosine Kinase Activity...' LIFE SCIENCES Bd. 62, Nr. 2, 1998, Seiten 143 - 150
    - HAMBY J.M.: 'Structure-Activity Relationships for...' J MED CHEM Bd. 40, 1997, Seiten 2296 - 2303
    - HUDZIAK R.M.: 'Monoclonal Antibody Has Antiproliferative Effecs...' MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY Bd. 9, Nr. 3, 1989, Seiten 1165 - 1172
    - HOLLIS SHOWALTER H.D.: 'Small Molecule Inhibitors...' PHARMACOL THER Bd. 76, Nr. 1-3, 1997, Seiten 55 - 71
    - CLARK R.: 'Antibosies specific for amino acid 12 of...' PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. Bd. 82, 1985, Seiten 5280 - 5284
    - DINNEY C.P. ET AL: 'Therapy of human transitional cell carcinoma of the bladder..' CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH Bd. 3, Nr. 2, 1997, Seiten 161 - 168
    - PARTANEN J. ET AL: 'FGFR-4, a novel acidic fibroblast growth factor receptor...' EMBO J Bd. 10, Nr. 6, 1991, Seiten 1347 - 1354
    - NORMANNO N. ET AL: 'Growth Inhibition of human colon carcinoma cells by...' CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH Bd. 2, Nr. 3, 1996, Seiten 601 - 609
    - ABRAMS S.I.: 'Mutant ras epitopes as targets for cancer vaccines' SEMIN ONCOL. Bd. 23, Nr. 1, 1996, Seiten 118 - 134
    - UENO H.: 'A Truncated Form of Fibroblast Growth Factor Receptor 1 inhibits...' THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY Bd. 267, Nr. 3, 1992, Seiten 1470 - 1476
    - YAN LI ET AL: 'Cell Transformation by Fibroblast' MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY Bd. 14, Nr. 11, 1994, Seiten 7660 - 7669
by applicantWO9713771
    - ULLRICH, A.; SCHLESSINGER, J., CELL, (1990), vol. 61, pages 203 - 212,