Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1055343

EP1055343 - A METHOD AND EQUIPMENT FOR CARRYING OUT SPECIAL FUNCTIONS IN A CELLULAR RADIO SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.07.2006
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.07.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.08.2006  [2006/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2002/11]
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
Nokia Networks Oy
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / LAAKSONEN, Pirkko
Karhikatu 1 A
FIN-33340 Tampere / FI
02 / EEVA, Pentti
Kielonkuja 4
FIN-05460 Hyvinkää / FI
[2000/48]
Representative(s)Äkräs, Tapio Juhani , et al
Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]Äkräs, Tapio Juhani , et al
Oy Kolster Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date99903697.308.02.1999
[2000/48]
WO1999FI00091
Priority number, dateFI1998000029209.02.1998         Original published format: FI 980292
[2000/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9940749
Date:12.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1055343
Date:29.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999
[2000/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1055343
Date:07.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/36]
Search report(s)International search reportSE12.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38
[2000/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/48]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON SPEZIALFUNKTIONEN IN EINEM ZELLULAREN FUNKSYSTEM[2000/48]
English:A METHOD AND EQUIPMENT FOR CARRYING OUT SPECIAL FUNCTIONS IN A CELLULAR RADIO SYSTEM[2000/48]
French:PROCEDE ET EQUIPEMENT POUR REALISER DES FONCTIONS SPECIALES DANS UN SYSTEME RADIOCELLULAIRE[2000/48]
Entry into regional phase18.08.2000National basic fee paid 
18.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
18.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
28.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.07.2005Fee for grant paid
07.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0658014  (MOTOROLA INC [US]);
 [A]US5557656  (RAY JIMMY C [US], et al);
 [Y]WO9738542  (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]);
 [AP]WO9858515  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al)