EP1047480 - ALL ROUND ROLLER SKATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2004 | Change - applicant | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PC Vane Inc. c/o Charles D. McClung Chernoff, Vilhauer, McClung & Stenzel, LLP 1600 Ods Tower 601 S.W. Second Avenue Portland, OR 97204 / US | [2004/21] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states PC Vane Inc. 5255 Camelot Forest Drive Jacksonville, FL 32258-2516 / US | ||
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states van Egeraat, Hendrikus Adrianus Svarta Bangatan 10B 702 32 Örebro / SE | ||
For all designated states Jacobsson, Jens Erik S:a Gärden Hasta 732 91 Arboga / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Egeraat, Hendrikus Adrianus Svarta Bangatan 10 B S-702 32 Örebro / SE | 02 /
Jacobsson, Jean Erik S:a Garden Hasta S-732 91 Arboga / SE | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2003/20] |
Former [2000/44] | Söderman, Päivi Karin Lisbeth Innopat Ltd, P.O. Box 556 02151 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 99903979.5 | 13.01.1999 | [2000/44] | WO1999SE00033 | Priority number, date | SE19980000090 | 16.01.1998 Original published format: SE 9800090 | [2000/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9936142 | Date: | 22.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1047480 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A63C17/14 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
A63C17/1427 (EP);
A63C17/06 (EP);
A63C2017/1481 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/44] | Title | German: | VIELSEITIG VERWENDBARE EINSPUR-ROLLSCHUHE | [2000/44] | English: | ALL ROUND ROLLER SKATE | [2000/44] | French: | PATIN A ROULETTES UNIVERSEL | [2000/44] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 17.08.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 02.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/14] | 14.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.10.2000 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   16.10.2000 | 02.10.2000 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   16.10.2000 | 02.10.2000 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   16.10.2000 | 02.10.2000 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   16.10.2000 | 02.10.2000 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   16.10.2000 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.10.2000 | M01   Fee paid on   16.10.2000 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9711759 ; | [A]US5232231 |