Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1045797

EP1045797 - RESEALABLE EASY OPEN CLOSURE AND CAN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.01.2008
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DIAMOND, George B.
62 Anthony Road
Glen Gardner, NJ 08826 / US
[2000/43]
Inventor(s)01 / DIAMOND, George, B.
62 Anthony Road
Glen Gardner, NJ 08826 / US
02 / HELMRICH, Ralph
4 Swayze Court
Asbury, NJ 08802 / US
[2000/43]
Representative(s)Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/43]Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date99904037.107.01.1999
[2000/43]
WO1999US00308
Priority number, dateUS19980070660P07.01.1998         Original published format: US 70660 P
[2000/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9935045
Date:15.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1045797
Date:25.10.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999
[2000/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:B65D41/18
[2000/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/43]
TitleGerman:WIEDERVERSCHLIESSBARER, LEICHT ZU ÖFFNENDER DOSENDECKEL[2000/43]
English:RESEALABLE EASY OPEN CLOSURE AND CAN[2000/43]
French:FERMETURE ET RECIPIENT REFERMABLE A OUVERTURE FACILE[2000/43]
Entry into regional phase31.07.2000National basic fee paid 
31.07.2000Search fee paid 
31.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
31.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/43]
01.08.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/07]
13.09.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200709   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US5054642  (YOSHIDA YOSHIAKI [JP]);
 [X]US2767754  (LEDERER FREDERICK E, et al);
 [Y]US4544080  (WRIGHT PHILIP M [US], et al);
 [Y]US4981229  (LANHAM SAMUEL E [US]);
 [A]US4266689  (ASHER LANCE A);
 [A]US4620642  (WERTZ KEITH J [US], et al);
 [A]US5398908  (KIENLE ERICH [CH]);
 [A]US3749276  (DAVIS P)
by applicantUS5758793
 US5617968
 US5511679
 US5125528
 US5085339
 US5050763
 US5042680
 US5020686
 US4724979
 US4724978
 US4699290
 US4682706
 US4660735
 US4529100
 US3557998
 US5145085
 US4741450
 US4473168
 US4434907
 US4433793
 US4427128
 US4385708
 US4165016
 US3998354
 US3356250
 US2998158