Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1051834

EP1051834 - CALL SETUP FOR IP/INTERNET TELEPHONY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.05.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.05.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.06.2004  [2004/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing SA
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing S.A.
46, Quai A. le Galo
92648 Boulogne Cedex / US
Inventor(s)01 / POLIT, Peter, Paul
8309 Reef Court
Indianapolis, IN 46236 / US
02 / LI, Wenhua
306 Ryan Trail
Brownsburg, IN 46112 / US
[2000/46]
Representative(s)Kohrs, Martin , et al
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [N/P]Kohrs, Martin , et al
Thomson 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Former [2000/46]Kohrs, Martin , et al
Thomson multimedia 46, quai A. Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Application number, filing date99904278.127.01.1999
[2000/46]
WO1999US01600
Priority number, dateUS19980072649P27.01.1998         Original published format: US 72649 P
[2000/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9938310
Date:29.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1051834
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999
[2000/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1051834
Date:02.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04M7/00
[2000/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/46]
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNGSAUFBAU FÜR IP/INTERNET TELEFONIE[2000/46]
English:CALL SETUP FOR IP/INTERNET TELEPHONY[2000/46]
French:ETABLISSEMENT D'APPEL POUR TELEPHONIE IP/INTERNET[2000/46]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2000National basic fee paid 
17.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
25.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.05.2003Fee for grant paid
02.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0781016  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column 6, line 50 - column 7, line 2 * * column 10, line 24 - column 12, line 31 * * figure 11 *;
 [A]EP0758175  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column 15, line 10 - column 17, line 41 * * column 27, line 40 - column 28, line 56 *;
 [PX]WO9811704  (DIALNET INC [US]) [PX] 1,7 * page 14, line 23 - page 15, line 20 *;
 [PX]WO9900954  (SIEMENS TELECOM NETWORKS [US]) [PX] 1,7 * the whole document *