Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1053461

EP1053461 - MECHANICAL HANDLING SYSTEMS FOR LASER CAPTURE MICRODISSECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.09.2011
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.09.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.10.2011  [2011/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT as represented by THE SECRETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Building 31, Room 5A50, National Institute of Health, 9000 Rockville Pike
Bethesda, MD 20892 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]For all designated states
UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT as represented by THE SECRETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Building 31, Room 5A50, National Institute of Health, 9000 Rockville Pike
Bethesda, MD 20892 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GOLDSTEIN, Seth, R.
National Institutes of Health, Bld. 13, Room 3N17
Bethesda, MD 20892 / US
02 / BONNER, Robert, F.
National Institutes of Health, Bld. 13, Room 3N17
Bethesda, MD 20892 / US
03 / SMITH, Paul, D.
National Institutes of Health, Bld. 13, Room 3N17
Bethesda, MD 20892 / US
04 / PETERSON, John
National Institutes of Health, Bld. 13, Room 3W12
Bethesda, MD 20892 / US
05 / POHIDA, Thomas
National Institutes of Health, Bld. 12A, Room 2033
Bethesda, MD 20892 / US
[2000/47]
Representative(s)Cross, James Peter Archibald , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/30]Cross, James Peter Archibald , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Former [2000/47]Milhench, Howard Leslie , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date99904451.429.01.1999
[2000/47]
WO1999US01987
Priority number, dateUS19980073480P03.02.1998         Original published format: US 73480 P
[2000/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9939176
Date:05.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1053461
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999
[2000/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01N1/28
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/47]
TitleGerman:MECHANISCHE HANDHABUNGSSYSTEME ZUR LASERERFASSUNGS-MIKRODISSEKTION[2000/47]
English:MECHANICAL HANDLING SYSTEMS FOR LASER CAPTURE MICRODISSECTION[2000/47]
French:SYSTEMES DE MANUTENTION MECANIQUE DESTINES A LA MICRODISSECTION PAR PIEGEAGE LASER[2000/47]
Entry into regional phase04.09.2000National basic fee paid 
04.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/40]
deletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
31.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
23.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/40]
29.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/41]
03.09.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/41]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.07.2007
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
16.05.2008Request for further processing filed
16.05.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
29.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
25.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
14.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200911   M06   Fee paid on   14.07.2009
31.01.201012   M06   Not yet paid
31.01.201113   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[PX]WO9900658  (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US]) [PX] 1,12-14,17,19,31,33-35,40,41,44-46 * page 7, line 7 - line 34 * * page 14, line 19 - line 38; figure 1 *;
 [DA]WO9713838  (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al) [DA] 1,17,19,31,33,41,44 * page 11, line 3 - page 12, line 25; figure 2 * * page 39, line 13 - page 41, line 35; figure 8 *;
 [DA]  - BONNER R F ET AL, "LASER CAPTURE MICRODISSECTION: MOLECULAR ANALYSIS OF TISSUE", SCIENCE, (19971121), vol. 5342, no. 278, page 1481, 1483, XP002060626

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.278.5342.1481
by applicantWO9713838