Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975812

EP0975812 - METHOD FOR GRANULATING AND GRINDING LIQUID SLAG AND DEVICE FOR REALISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.01.2003
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.03.2003  [2003/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Holcim Ltd.
Zürcherstrasse 156
8645 Jona / CH
[N/P]
Former [2001/33]For all designated states
Holcim Ltd.
Zürcherstrasse 156
8645 Jona / CH
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
HOLDERBANK FINANCIERE GLARUS AG
Insel 14
CH-8750 Glarus / CH
Inventor(s)01 / EDLINGER, Alfred
Chilemattweg 31
CH-5400 Baden / CH
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Haffner, Thomas M.
Haffner und Keschmann
Patentanwälte KG
Schottengasse 3a
1014 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Haffner, Thomas M., Dr.
Patentanwalt, Haffner, Thomas M., Dr., Schottengasse 3a
1014 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date99904606.317.02.1999
[2000/05]
WO1999AT00040
Priority number, dateAT19980000094U18.02.1998         Original published format: AT 9498 U
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9942623
Date:26.08.1999
Language:DE
[1999/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975812
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:C21B3/08, C21B3/06
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LU [2000/05]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM GRANULIEREN UND ZERKLEINERN VON FLÜSSIGEN SCHLACKEN SOWIE EINRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS[2000/05]
English:METHOD FOR GRANULATING AND GRINDING LIQUID SLAG AND DEVICE FOR REALISING THE SAME[2000/05]
French:PROCEDE POUR GRANULER ET BROYER DES SCORIES LIQUIDES ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE METTRE LEDIT PROCEDE EN OEUVRE[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase08.10.1999National basic fee paid 
08.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
29.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/11]
07.10.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[YA]US2533633  (SCHOTT CHARLES W) [Y] 1,2 * column 1, line 1 - line 5 * * column 1, line 32 - line 52 * * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 55 * * figures 2,3; claims 1-5 * [A] 4;
 [Y]JPS541296  ;
 [A]WO9515402  (HOLDERBANK FINANC GLARUS [CH], et al) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS61243104  ;
 [DA]GB1032608  (FRED OSBORNE) [DA] 1,4 * figure -; claims 1,3 *;
 [PA]JPH10296206
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19790307), vol. 003, no. 027, Database accession no. (C - 039), & JP54001296 A 19790108 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [Y] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870320), vol. 011, no. 090, Database accession no. (M - 573), & JP61243104 A 19861029 (NIPPON JIRYOKU SENKO KK) [A] 1,4 * abstract *
 [PA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990226), vol. 099, no. 002, & JP10296206 A 19981110 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [PA] 1,4 * abstract *