EP1044335 - SUCTION CUP HOLDER WITH AN ADDITIONAL ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gian, Hung Chang Breite Strasse 16 14199 Berlin / DE | [2000/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/42] | Representative(s) | Heitsch, Wolfgang Patentanwalt Göhlsdorfer Strasse 3 14550 Gross Kreutz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/42] | Heitsch, Wolfgang Göhlsdorfer Strasse 25g 14778 Jeserig / DE | Application number, filing date | 99904699.8 | 06.01.1999 | [2000/42] | WO1999DE00026 | Priority number, date | DE1998100675 | 10.01.1998 Original published format: DE 19800675 | [2000/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9935410 | Date: | 15.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1044335 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1044335 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16B47/00 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
F16B47/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/42] | Title | German: | SAUGHALTER MIT EINER ZUSATZEINRICHTUNG | [2000/42] | English: | SUCTION CUP HOLDER WITH AN ADDITIONAL ELEMENT | [2000/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION A VENTOUSE DOTE D'UN ELEMENT SUPPLEMENTAIRE | [2000/42] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/42] | 23.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 04.10.2001 | IT | 04.10.2001 | NL | 04.10.2001 | AT | 06.01.2002 | FR | 31.01.2002 | ES | 30.04.2002 | [2008/42] |
Former [2008/17] | GB | 04.10.2001 | |
IT | 04.10.2001 | ||
NL | 04.10.2001 | ||
AT | 06.01.2002 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2004/05] | GB | 04.10.2001 | |
NL | 04.10.2001 | ||
AT | 06.01.2002 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/37] | GB | 04.10.2001 | |
NL | 04.10.2001 | ||
AT | 06.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | GB | 04.10.2001 | |
NL | 04.10.2001 | ||
Former [2002/37] | GB | 04.10.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2817482 (RUGGIERO ARTHUR D, et al) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 71 - column 2, line 65; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US3638878 (MORRIS HEBER L) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 14 - line 68; figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR2347563 (LESQUENDIEU JACQUES [FR]) [A] 1,4,6 * page 2, line 39 - page 3, line 5; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE2659684 (REPA FEINSTANZWERK GMBH) [A] 1,2* page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 18; figures 1-5 *; | [A]GB2274135 (BRETTEN CHERRY LAMORNA [GB]) [A] 1,3 * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 17; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9733096 (LUNDBERG & SON VVS PRODUKTER A [SE], et al) [A] 1,4,6 * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 39; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | DE7803207U | DE3008463 | DE8612888U | EP0276830 | DE4013747 | DE4130107 | DE4123910 | DE4214249 | DE29510539U |