Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1047987

EP1047987 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REPRESENTING AND MONITORING FUNCTIONAL PARAMETERS OF A PHYSIOLOGICAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.05.2003
Database last updated on 25.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 27.11.2013  [2013/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
energy lab technologies GmbH
Burchardstrasse 21
20095 Hamburg / DE
[2002/48]
Former [2001/45]For all designated states
energy lab Beteiligungs GmbH
Imhofstrasse 78 a
86159 Augsburg / DE
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
Cybernetic Vision AG
Friedrichstrasse 200
10117 Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SOULA, Anatoli
Lubertsy 3, Haus 36
Moscow Region, 140003 / RU
02 / KITACHINE, Youri
Lubertsy 3, Haus 3
Moscow Region, 140003 / RU
03 / GILLESSEN, Werner
Ernst-Thälmann-Strasse 91
D-15344 Strausberg / DE
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/19]Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
Former [2002/09](deleted)
...
Former [2000/44]Gross, Felix , et al
Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Xantener Strasse 10
D-10707 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date99904717.812.01.1999
[2000/44]
WO1999DE00080
Priority number, dateDE199810124012.01.1998         Original published format: DE 19801240
[2000/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9935558
Date:15.07.1999
Language:DE
[1999/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1047987
Date:02.11.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999
[2000/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1047987
Date:26.06.2002
Language:DE
[2002/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/00, A61B5/04
[2002/06]
Former International [2000/44]G06F3/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [2000/44]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DARSTELLUNG UND ÜBERWACHUNG VON FUNKTIONSPARAMETERN EINES PHYSIOLOGISCHEN SYSTEMS[2000/44]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REPRESENTING AND MONITORING FUNCTIONAL PARAMETERS OF A PHYSIOLOGICAL SYSTEM[2000/44]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE REPRESENTATION ET DE SURVEILLANCE DE PARAMETRES FONCTIONS D'UN SYSTEME PHYSIOLOGIQUE[2000/44]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2000National basic fee paid 
17.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.07.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
22.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.04.2002Fee for grant paid
22.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)27.03.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200103   M06   Fee paid on   09.07.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK26.09.2002
SE26.09.2002
ES20.12.2002
AT12.01.2003
[2013/48]
Former [2004/31]DK26.09.2002
SE26.09.2002
ES20.12.2002
AT12.01.2003
Former [2004/05]DK26.09.2002
SE26.09.2002
ES20.12.2002
Former [2003/46]DK26.09.2002
SE26.09.2002
Former [2002/49]SE26.09.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]US5215099  (HABERL RALPH [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 63 *
 [XA]  - MOURA L ET AL, "A microcomputer-based cardiac mapping system for recurrent ventricular tachycardia surgery", PROCEEDINGS OF COMPUTER IN CARDIOLOGY 1992 (CAT. NO.92CH3259-9), DURHAM, NC, USA, 11-14 OCT. 1992, ISBN 0-8186-3552-5, 1992, Los Alamitos, CA, USA, IEEE Comput. Soc. Press, USA, pages 431 - 434, XP002107065 [X] 1,2 * page 431, column L, line 1 - page 434, column L, line 37; figures 1-6 * [A] 3-20

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CIC.1992.269506
 [XA]  - BRANHAM B H ET AL, "A system for accurate interactive 3-D display of cardiac electrical activity", PROCEEDINGS OF COMPUTER IN CARDIOLOGY 1992 (CAT. NO.92CH3259-9), DURHAM, NC, USA, 11-14 OCT. 1992, ISBN 0-8186-3552-5, 1992, Los Alamitos, CA, USA, IEEE Comput. Soc. Press, USA, pages 335 - 338, XP002107066 [X] 1,2 * page 335, column L, line 1 - page 337, column R, line 50 * [A] 3-20

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CIC.1992.269363
 [XA]  - YOUNG M R ET AL, "A real-time data acquisition system for the display of three dimensional cardiac activation maps", PROCEEDINGS OF COMPUTER IN CARDIOLOGY 1992 (CAT. NO.92CH3259-9), DURHAM, NC, USA, 11-14 OCT. 1992, ISBN 0-8186-3552-5, 1992, Los Alamitos, CA, USA, IEEE Comput. Soc. Press, USA, pages 331 - 334, XP002107067 [X] 1,2 * page 331, column L, line 1 - page 333, column R, line 36 * [A] 3-20

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CIC.1992.269364
 [A]  - CALDERON A ET AL, "3-D mapping of body surface potentials", MEDICAL INFORMATICS, APRIL-JUNE 1987, UK, ISSN 0307-7640, vol. 12, no. 2, pages 125 - 135, XP002107068 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *